Yuri Doering v. Geraldo's Meat Market, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-05578 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 9:15 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Geraldos Meat Market Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Yuri Doering
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form
Tue 09/10 12:36 PM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Mon 09/09 3:21 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Geraldos Meat Market Inc. filed by plaintiff Yuri Doering. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 08/12 4:02 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Yuri Doering, upon Defendant Geraldos Meat Market Inc. served on 8/2/2024, answer due 8/23/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JOSE F GERALDO, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 07/02 2:07 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Geraldos Meat Market Inc.. (sh) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form
Tue 07/02 2:02 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (sh) |
|
Att: 1 CV-11C | ||
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 07/01 3:51 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Yuri Doering. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 07/01 3:51 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 07/01 3:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Yuri Doering. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 07/01 3:46 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37754946 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Yuri Doering(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |