Roque Solis et al v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-05587 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 02, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 9:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
Affinia Default Services, LLC
McCalla Raymer Liebert Pierce, LLP 301 E. Ocean Blvd. Suite 1720 Long Beach
Long Beach, CA 90802 |
|
Defendant
Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Heritage Plaza MTG Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Bank of New York Mellon
|
|
Defendant
US Bank NA Series 2004 4SL
|
|
Plaintiff
Roque Solis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zoila Solis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
transfer
Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form
Tue 07/02 2:25 PM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Shashi H. Kewalramani. New Case Number 5:24-cv-1379-SHK. (sh) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Summons Request
Mon 07/01 5:38 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs ROQUE SOLIS, ZOILA SOLIS. (Shapero, Sarah) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Mon 07/01 5:37 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs ROQUE SOLIS, ZOILA SOLIS. (Shapero, Sarah) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 07/01 5:36 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs ROQUE SOLIS, ZOILA SOLIS. (Shapero, Sarah) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Mon 07/01 5:35 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff ROQUE SOLIS, ZOILA SOLIS. (Shapero, Sarah) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 07/01 5:34 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs ROQUE SOLIS, ZOILA SOLIS. (Shapero, Sarah) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 07/01 5:33 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37756319 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs ROQUE SOLIS, ZOILA SOLIS. (Attorney Sarah Elizabeth Shapero added to party ROQUE SOLIS(pty:pla), Attorney Sarah Elizabeth Shapero added to party ZOILA SOLIS(pty:pla))(Shapero, Sarah) |