Olson v. O'Malley
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Derrick K Watson |
Referred: | Wes Reber Porter |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00282 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/25/2024 11:59 PM HST |
Tuesday, September 24, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
1 - Terminate Motion Deadlines/Hearings (inc F&R) Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 09/24 12:01 PM
EO: For good cause shown, Plaintiff Julie Olson's motion for extension of time to file an opening brief, Dkt. No. 11, is GRANTED. As a result, the Court sets the following revised briefing schedule in this case: Plaintiff's opening brief shall be due on or before October 30, 2024; the Commissioner's response brief shall be due on or before December 2, 2024; Plaintiff's reply brief shall be due on or before December 16, 2024. Thereafter, the Court will determine whether a hearing is necessary following review of the parties' briefs. IT IS SO ORDERED. (CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON) (rls) |
|
Monday, September 23, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 09/23 2:35 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opening Brief Danielle Rose Beaver appearing for Plaintiff Julie Olson (Beaver, Danielle) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
minutes
2 - Set Deadlines Link
Wed 09/04 8:16 AM
EO: Pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security, the Court sets the following briefing schedule in this case: Plaintiff's opening brief shall be due on or before September 30, 2024; the Acting Commissioner's brief shall be due on or before October 30, 2024; and plaintiff's reply brief shall be due on or before November 13, 2024. Thereafter, the Court will determine whether a hearing is necessary following review of the parties' briefs. IT IS SO ORDERED. (CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON) (tyk) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Administrative Record
Fri 08/30 10:04 AM
Administrative Record. RCD=12/30/2024.(Barbata, Dana) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records | ||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance - Commissioner
Fri 07/12 12:16 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edmund Jack Darcher appearing for Commissioner of Social Security (Paperless filing) on behalf of Martin O'Malley. (Darcher, Edmund) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/11 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dana A. Barbata on behalf of Martin O'Malley on behalf of Martin O'Malley. (Barbata, Dana) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Case Reassignment
Tue 07/02 10:39 AM
NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect new Civil case number CV 24-00282 DKW-WRP on all further pleadings . (jni) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Consent Election Form
Tue 07/02 8:18 AM
|
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Social Security Case Service
Tue 07/02 8:12 AM
NOTICE of Social Security Case Service: Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405 (g), the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Case Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System (CM/ECF) notifying the appropriate Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorneys Office of the filing of this case. (jni) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/02 8:01 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Tue 07/02 7:50 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00282 WRP on all further pleadings . (jni) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/01 5:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Martin O'Malley ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-3022039.), filed by Julie Olson.(Beaver, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |