SYEDE ENTERPRISES, INC
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Eduardo V Rodriguez |
Case #: | 4:24-bk-33114 |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2024 |
Dismissed: | Aug 16, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 05, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
SYEDE ENTERPRISES, INC
5714 Comal Park Ct
Houston, TX 77059-1405 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 09/05 2:13 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (njc7) |
||
Sunday, August 18, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 08/18 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 08/18/2024. (Admin.) |
|
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 08/18 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 08/18/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
order
Amended Order
Fri 08/16 2:18 PM
Amended Order Dismissing Debtor. Signed on 8/16/2024 (njc7) |
|
21 | 21
order
Dismissing Debtor(s)
Fri 08/16 9:43 AM
Order Dismissing Debtor Signed on 8/16/2024 (njc7) |
|
court
Courtroom Minutes (Text)
Fri 08/16 9:42 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 9:00 a.m.. Appearances: Sam Milledge for the Debtor; Ted Walker for Stellar Bank; Kimberly Bartley for Houston Realty Partners. Minutes: Show Cause hearing held. Motion to dismiss15 taken up. There was no opposition to dismissal. Case dismissed. Order to be issued by the Court. (njc7) |
||
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 08/15 11:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 08/15/2024. (Admin.) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Response to Order
Thu 08/15 9:33 PM
Response to Order Show Cause Order . (Filed By SYEDE ENTERPRISES, INC ) (Milledge, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A & B | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 8 | ||
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
order
Show Cause
Tue 08/13 1:05 PM
Order to Show Cause Signed on 8/13/2024 Show Cause hearing to be held on 8/16/2024 at 09:00 AM via telephone and video conference. (njc7) |
|
court
Courtroom Minutes (Text)
Tue 08/13 9:16 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 9:00 a.m.. Appearances: Andrew Jimenez for United States Trustee. Minutes: Counsel and Debtor's Counsel did not appear. Mr. Jimenez provided an update to the Court regarding 341 meeting. Show cause hearing to be set by the Court for 8/28/2024 at 9:00 a.m. for Debtors failure to appear. (njc7) |
||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Amended Petition (Attorney Use)
Fri 08/02 11:20 PM
Amended Petition , Schedules & SOFA (Filed By SYEDE ENTERPRISES, INC ). (Milledge, Samuel) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 07/25 12:07 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by James William Freyer Filed by on behalf of Gholamreza Khoshnevis (Freyer, James) |
|
court
Hearing Set
Thu 07/25 10:26 AM
Hearing Set on Debtor's Emergency Motion to Dismiss Case Under 11 U.S.C. §1112(b)(1) for Cause and Local Rule 9013-1(i), per Motion. Hearing scheduled for 8/28/2024 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 402 (EVR). (njc7) |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Emergency Motion
Wed 07/24 3:29 PM
Emergency Motion to dismiss bankruptcy Filed by Debtor SYEDE ENTERPRISES, INC (Milledge, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 07/19 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/19/2024. (Admin.) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 07/19 10:28 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Kimberly Anne Bartley Filed by on behalf of Houston Realty Partners, LLC (Bartley, Kimberly) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 07/17 2:19 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Ted L Walker Filed by on behalf of Stellar Bank f/k/a Allegiance Bank (Walker, Ted) |
|
11 | 11
order
Expedited Consideration
Wed 07/17 11:51 AM
Order Striking. ,,, Signed on 7/17/2024. (njc7) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Expedited Consideration
Tue 07/16 3:17 PM
Motion for Expedited Consideration . Filed by Debtor SYEDE ENTERPRISES, INC (Milledge, Samuel) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Generic Motion
Tue 07/16 3:15 PM
Amended Motion Motion for Authority to Sell or in the alternative voluntarily dismiss case Filed by Debtor SYEDE ENTERPRISES, INC (Milledge, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
motion
Expedited Consideration
Tue 07/16 2:46 PM
Motion for Expedited Consideration . Filed by Debtor SYEDE ENTERPRISES, INC (Milledge, Samuel) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Generic Motion
Tue 07/16 2:43 PM
Motion for authority to sell property or in the alternative allow voluntary dismissal Filed by Debtor SYEDE ENTERPRISES, INC (Milledge, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 07/15 3:05 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Susan R. Fuertes Filed by on behalf of Harris County, ATTN: Property Tax Division (Fuertes, Susan) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 07/12 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/12/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Setting Hearing
Wed 07/10 4:08 PM
Order for Electronic Chapter 11 Status Conference. Signed on 7/10/2024 Status conference to be held on 8/13/2024 at 09:00 AM via telephone and video conference. (njc7) |
|
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Fri 07/05 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 07/05/2024. (Admin.) |
|
crditcrd
none
Fri 07/05 7:50 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-33114 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number B25407258. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
trustee
Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors for Corporate Debtor Set (BNC NOTICING)
Tue 07/02 10:47 AM
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 for Non-Individual Debtor Set 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/7/2024 at 10:00 AM, US Trustee Houston Teleconference. Last day to object to dischargeability under section 523 is 10/7/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 11/5/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 12/30/2024. (Jimenez, Andrew) |
|
trustee
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 07/02 10:37 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Andrew Jimenez (Jimenez, Andrew) |
||
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
33
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Mon 07/01 9:07 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by SYEDE ENTERPRISES, INC. Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) due by 12/30/2024. (Milledge, Samuel) |