HALL EL v. HALL-EL et al
North Carolina Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Loretta C Biggs |
Referred: | Joe L Webster |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00546 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal) |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 22, 2024 |
Petitioner
WILLIAM SALAAM HALL EL
|
|
Respondent
JASMINE HALL-EL
|
|
Respondent
LEILANI MAYFIELD
|
|
Respondent
LISA JOHNSON-TONKINS
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment
Thu 08/22 4:56 PM
JUDGMENT signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 08/19/2024, that the petition, (ECF No.1 ), filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241 be dismissed, that judgment be entered dismissing the action, that the Clerk of Court be directed to notify Petitioner about said dismissal, and that, there being no substantial issue for appeal concerning the denial of a constitutional right affecting the conviction nor a debatable procedural ruling, a certificate of appealability not issue. (lg) |
|
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendations
Thu 08/22 4:52 PM
ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 08/19/2024, that the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation, (ECF No.2 ), is ADOPTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the petition, (ECF No.1 ), filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241 be DISMISSED, that judgment be entered dismissing the action, that the Clerk of Court be directed to notify Petitioner about said dismissal, and that, there being no substantial issue for appeal concerning the denial of a constitutional right affecting the conviction nor a debatable procedural ruling, a certificate of appealability not issue. A Judgment dismissing this action will be entered contemporaneously with this Order. (lg) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Referred to Judge
Thu 08/15 3:13 PM
CASE REFERRED RE:2 RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE , to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS (db) |
||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Objection to Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/23 4:08 PM
OBJECTION entitled "Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation and Motion for Recusal of Magistrate Judge" re:2 Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge, filed by Petitioner WILLIAM SALAAM HALL EL. (lg) |
|
Att: 1 Inner Envelope Front and Back, | ||
Att: 2 Outer Envelope Front and Back | ||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Mailing Recommendation
Fri 07/12 11:16 AM
Notice of Mailing Recommendation: Objections to R&R due by 7/26/2024. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 7/29/2024. (lg) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge
Fri 07/12 11:11 AM
RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 07/12/2024, that the petition (Docket Entry1 ) filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241 be dismissed, that judgment be entered dismissing the action, that the Clerk of Court be directed to notify Petitioner about said dismissal, and that, there being no substantial issue for appeal concerning the denial of a constitutional right affecting the conviction nor a debatable procedural ruling, a certificate of appealability not issue. (lg) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Mon 07/01 4:08 PM
Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (lg) |
||
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 07/01 9:18 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by SHEIK WILLIAM SALAAM HALL EL.. (cc) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope - Front and Back |