Colorado District Court
Judge:Lewis T Babcock
Case #: 1:24-cv-01826
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2024
Terminated:Sep 05, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/24/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, February 07, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Fri 02/07 3:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER The motion is DENIED. As explained in the Court's order granting Plaintiff leave to proceed in this action under 28 U.S.C. § 1915, Plaintiff must "pay the full amount of the required $350.00 filing fee pursuant to § 1915(b)(1) regardless of the outcome of this action." (ECF No. 4 at 2). By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/7/2025.(norlin, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
13 13 3 pgs motion Order Wed 02/05 3:51 PM
MOTION to Suspend or Vacate Filing Fee by Plaintiff Derrick Allison. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
12 12 6 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Order Dismissing Case Thu 09/05 3:16 PM
ORDER TO STAY AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE This action is STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED,subject to reopening for good cause after resolution of the underlying state proceedings. If Plaintiff desires to continue with this case after the conclusion of the state proceedings, he must submit a written request in this case that the stay be lifted, within thirty (30) days of disposition of the state proceedings. IfPlaintiff files an appeal in the state case, a written request to lift the stay must be filedwithin thirty (30) days of the completion of the appellate proceedings. All pending motions are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as moot. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/5/2024. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
11 11 respm Brief in Support of Motion Wed 08/28 3:34 PM
BRIEF in Support of10 MOTION to Amend1 Complaint,, filed by Plaintiff Derrick Allison. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Amend/Correct/Modify Wed 08/28 3:34 PM
MOTION for Leave to Amend1 Complaint by Plaintiff Derrick Allison. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
9 9 motion File Excess Pages Wed 08/28 3:32 PM
MOTION to Exceed 30 Pages for Complaint by Plaintiff Derrick Allison. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 08/28 3:31 PM
PRISONER MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Derrick Allison. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
7 7 4 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 08/02 3:50 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is directed to show cause within twenty-one (21) daysfrom the date of this order why this case should not be stayed and administratively closed pending the outcome in his ongoing state case. If Plaintiff fails to show cause as directed within the time allowed, the Prisoner Complaint and the instant action will be stayed and administratively closed, subject to reopening for good cause after resolution of the stateproceedings and any associated appeal. By Magistrate Judge Richard Thomas Gurley on 8/2/2024. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
6 6 misc Reassigning Magistrate Judge Mon 07/29 11:59 AM
REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Upon his appointment and with the permission of Chief Judge Brimmer pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), this action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Gurley at the end of the case number (such as 24-cv-1826-RTG ). (Text only entry). (angar, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
5 5 misc Payment Received Tue 07/23 12:11 PM
PLRA PAYMENT RECEIVED from Derrick Allison in the amount of $ 12.00; Receipt Number 111272; Initial Payment. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
4 4 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 07/15 2:14 PM
ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1915 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (ECF No.2 ) is granted. Within thirty days from the date of this order Plaintiff'scustodian shall disburse from Plaintiffs prison account an initial partial filing fee of $12.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Colorado, which represents 20 percent of the greater of the (1) average monthly deposits, or (2) average monthly balance in Plaintiffs prison account for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b). The Clerk of Court shall not issue process at this time. The United States Marshals Service shall serve process on any remaining defendant(s) for whom personal service is required if the case is later drawn to a district judge or a magistrate judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(c). By Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 7/15/2024.(norlin, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
3 3 misc Case Assigned to Judge Mon 07/01 8:28 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 07/01 8:27 AM
Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Derrick Allison.(efoga, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/01 8:26 AM
PRISONER COMPLAINT against Donald Adam, Blackney, John Brooks, Cinnamon, City of Louisville, City of Louisville (I), Julian Clark, Davis, Jeremiah DeHerrera, Joe DiGiovanni, Scott Farrell, Ryan Haylett, Logan Haymore, Benjamin Hibl, Jeff, Kevin Kelley, Lindsey Knast, Ben Kurtz, Gustavo Mejia, Michael Montez, Thomas F. Mulvahill, Ross Murphy, Christopher Norcia, Barrett Odenbach, Kevin Perez, Julie Petterson, Lori Pieper, Lori (I) Pieper, Marcelo Rainero, Ben Redard, Joshua Scrudder, Matt Stoneberger, Suong Kim Thi Tran, Suong Kim (I) Thi Tran, Daniel Lee Volz, filed by Derrick Allison.(efoga, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Envelope