McVey v. Bell Mountain Ranch Equestrian Center, LLC
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Charlotte N Sweeney |
Referred: | Maritza Dominguez Braswell |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01841 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 10:54 AM MDT |
Defendant
Bell Mountain Ranch Equestrian Center, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Stacy McVey
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
utility
Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC
Thu 08/08 11:02 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal filed in this case on 8/8/24 at ECF No.15 . Text Only Entry (jdyne) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case
Thu 08/08 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Stacy McVey (Yim, Deborah) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Thu 08/01 8:00 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacy McVey. Bell Mountain Ranch Equestrian Center, LLC served on 7/26/2024, Answer due 8/16/2024. (sphil, ) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Summons Issued
Fri 07/19 2:50 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (ccuen, ) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 07/19 2:49 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re:1 Complaint for Service of Process. (ccuen, ) |
|
Att: 1 USMS Service Form | ||
11 | 11
4
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/19 2:19 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/14/2024. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 7/19/2024. (evaug) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 07/19 8:26 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 7/19/24. Text Only Entry (jdyne) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Thu 07/18 4:07 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (schap, ) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 07/18 4:05 PM
ORDER DRAWING CASE by Magistrate Judge Richard Thomas Gurley on 7/18/2024. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. All further proceedings should be designated as 24-cv-01841-CNS . (schap, ) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/15 8:58 AM
ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1915. The Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No.2 ) is granted . The court review Plaintiff's pleading pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). The Clerk of Court shall not issue process at this time. The United States Marshals Service shall serve process on any remaining defendant(s) for whom personal service is required if the case is later drawn to a district judge or a magistrate judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(c), by Magistrate Judge Richard Thomas Gurley on 7/15/2024. (ccuen, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Reassigning Judge
Tue 07/02 9:29 AM
CASE REASSIGNED. This case was originally assigned incorrectly, therefore has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard Thomas Gurley. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-01841-RTG. (Text only entry) (blaws) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Tue 07/02 8:47 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (blaws) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Summons Request
Mon 07/01 11:44 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to DEFENDANT BELL MOUNTAIN RANCH EQUESTRIAN CENTER, LLC re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Stacy McVey. (Yim, Deborah) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Petition/Application
Mon 07/01 11:43 PM
PETITION (CIVIL COVER SHEET) , filed by Stacy McVey.(Yim, Deborah) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Petition/Application
Mon 07/01 11:38 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS , filed by Stacy McVey.(Yim, Deborah) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/01 11:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Bell Mountain Ranch Equestrian Center, LLC Attorney Deborah Yim added to party Stacy McVey(pty:pla), filed by Stacy McVey.(Yim, Deborah) |