Washington Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher M Alston
Case #: 2:24-bk-11645
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Jul 29, 2024
Terminated:Oct 16, 2024

Debtor
A Street Pub LLC
18 Auburn Way S
Auburn, WA 98002-5426
Represented By
John A Sterbick
Sterbick And Associates, P.S.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Ronald G. Brown
Ronald G. Brown, Chapter 7 Trustee P.O. Box 2369
Kirkland, WA 98083
US Trustee
United States Trustee
700 Stewart St Ste 5103
Seattle, WA 98101


Docket last updated: 07/02/2024 12:47 AM PDT
Monday, July 01, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 07/01 8:27 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition ( 24-11645 [misc,1028] ( 338.00). Receipt number A28398512. Fee amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Creditors Uploaded Mon 07/01 8:31 AM
Creditor matrix uploaded/added 5 creditor(s). (admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (OTC) Mon 07/01 8:27 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, Non-Individual . Filed by John A Sterbick of Sterbick and Associates, P.S. on behalf of A Street Pub, LLC (Sterbick, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 WAWBApi Meeting of Creditors-Business Chapter 7 - No Asset Mon 07/01 8:29 AM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting Appointment of Interim Trustee Brown, Ronald G. with to be held on 7/29/2024 at 12:00 PM at Telephonic Creditors Meeting Seattle. (Sterbick, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 court 341 Notice Prepare Mon 07/01 9:25 AM
341 Meeting of Creditors Notice Sent to BNC for Mailing . (MEH)
Related: [-]