Crimson Caravan
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey P Norman |
Case #: | 4:24-bk-33126 |
Case Filed: | Jul 02, 2024 |
Dismissed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 13, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Crimson Caravan
16023 Bear Hill Dr
Houston, TX 77084-3505 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 9 minutes ago |
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 08/13 1:45 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (trc4) |
||
Saturday, July 20, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 07/20 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/20/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Dismissing Debtor(s)
Thu 07/18 12:15 PM
Order Dismissing Case Signed 7/18/2024. Barred Debtor Crimson Caravan starting 7/18/2024 to 1/13/2025 (trc4) |
|
Saturday, July 13, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sat 07/13 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 07/13/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
court
No Creditor Mailing List
Fri 07/12 10:34 AM
No Creditor Mailing List (bli4) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
trustee
Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors for Corporate Debtor Set (BNC NOTICING)
Wed 07/10 2:00 PM
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 for Non-Individual Debtor Set 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/2/2024 at 03:30 PM, US Trustee Houston Teleconference. Proofs of Claims due by 9/10/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 1/6/2025. (Travis, Christopher) |
|
Sunday, July 07, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Relief from Stay
Sun 07/07 5:43 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay . Fee Amount $199. Filed by Creditor Jet Lending, LLC Hearing scheduled for 7/24/2024 at 09:30 AM at Houston, Courtroom 403 (JPN). (Battaglia, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Complaint D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order | ||
crditcrd
none
Sun 07/07 5:44 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK 24-33126 ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A25409525. Fee amount $ 199.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 07/05 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/05/2024. (Admin.) |
|
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 07/05 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/05/2024. (Admin.) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 07/05 11:18 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Richard Anthony Battaglia Filed by on behalf of Jet Lending, LLC (Battaglia, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case
Wed 07/03 10:00 AM
Order to Show Cause for Dismissal of Case Signed on 7/3/2024 Show Cause hearing to be held on 7/29/2024 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 403 (JPN). (mar4) |
|
4 | 4
order
Setting Hearing
Wed 07/03 9:58 AM
Order to Debtor in Possession and Setting Hearing Signed on 7/3/2024 Status conference to be held on 8/28/2024 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 403 (JPN). (mar4) |
|
utility
Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadlines
Wed 07/03 9:59 AM
Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline Updated Chapter 11 Plan due by 9/30/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 9/30/2024. (mar4) |
||
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
court
Pro Se Filer Identification (Submitted)
Tue 07/02 9:17 AM
Pro Se Filer Identification (Debtor - Jason Paul Bible ). (dm4) |
|
2 | 2
court
Statement of Social Security Number(s) Submitted
Tue 07/02 9:16 AM
Statement of Social Security Number Filed. Does this document change the social security number for one or more debtors? No. Has the Meeting of Creditors been set in this case? No. (dm4) |
|
1 | 1
4
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Tue 07/02 8:32 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Crimson Caravan . Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) due by 12/30/2024. (dm4) |
|
trustee
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 07/02 10:54 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Christopher Ross Travis (Travis, Christopher) |
||
trustee
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 07/02 12:01 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jana Smith Whitworth (Whitworth, Jana) |