|
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 08/13 1:44 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (trc4)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 07/20 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/20/2024. (Admin.)
|
11
|
|
11
order
Dismissing Debtor(s)
Thu 07/18 12:19 PM
Order Dismissing Case Signed 7/18/2024. Barred Debtor RDKXOK LLC starting 7/18/2024 to 1/13/2025 Related [+] (trc4)
|
10
|
|
10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sat 07/13 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/13/2024. (Admin.)
|
9
|
|
9
court
No Creditor Mailing List
Fri 07/12 10:35 AM
No Creditor Mailing List (bli4)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
trustee
Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors for Corporate Debtor Set (BNC NOTICING)
Wed 07/10 2:02 PM
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 for Non-Individual Debtor Set 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/2/2024 at 04:30 PM, US Trustee Houston Teleconference. Proofs of Claims due by 9/10/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 1/6/2025. (Travis, Christopher)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 07/05 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/05/2024. (Admin.)
|
6
|
|
6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 07/05 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/05/2024. (Admin.)
|
5
|
|
5
order
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case
Wed 07/03 10:17 AM
Order to Show Cause for Dismissal of Case Signed on 7/3/2024 Show Cause hearing to be held on 7/29/2024 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 403 (JPN). (mar4)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
order
Setting Hearing
Wed 07/03 10:15 AM
Order to Debtor in Possession and Setting Hearing Signed on 7/3/2024 Related [+] Status conference to be held on 8/28/2024 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 403 (JPN). (mar4)
|
|
|
utility
Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadlines
Wed 07/03 10:16 AM
Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline Updated Related [+] Chapter 11 Plan due by 9/30/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 9/30/2024. (mar4)
|
3
|
|
3
court
Pro Se Filer Identification (Submitted)
Tue 07/02 9:21 AM
Pro Se Filer Identification (Debtor - Jason Paul Bible ). (dm4)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
court
Statement of Social Security Number(s) Submitted
Tue 07/02 9:20 AM
Statement of Social Security Number Filed. Does this document change the social security number for one or more debtors? No. Has the Meeting of Creditors been set in this case? No. (dm4)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
4
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Tue 07/02 8:35 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $1738 Filed by RDKXOK LLC . Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) due by 12/30/2024. (dm4)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
trustee
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 07/02 10:55 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Christopher Ross Travis (Travis, Christopher)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
trustee
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 07/02 12:08 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jana Smith Whitworth (Whitworth, Jana)
Related: [-]
|