Rayburn v. Pinkston et al
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy L Brooks |
Referred: | Christy D Comstock |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-05137 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 02, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
3
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendations ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 08/19 9:51 AM
ORDER finding as moot6 Report and Recommendations. Response to Order due by 9/9/2024. See order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 19, 2024. (ria) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 08/06 8:05 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT as to1 Complaint (42:1983) against Jorge Reyes, Jeffrey Lehman, Scott Peters, Austin Pinkston, Benton County, Arkansas, filed by Jesse James Rayburn. Related document:1 Complaint (42:1983) filed by Jesse James Rayburn.(bjb) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 07/29 11:59 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Jesse James Rayburn. Objections to R&R due by 8/15/2024. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on July 29, 2024. (src) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Tue 07/02 8:59 AM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (ria) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Clerk's Order PLRA Initial Fee
Tue 07/02 8:56 AM
CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Benton County Detention Center to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $13.33; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Benton County Jail). (ria) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983)
Tue 07/02 8:44 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff. Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350.00. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on July 2, 2024. (ria) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983)
Tue 07/02 8:34 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Jesse James Rayburn. Motions referred to Christy D. Comstock.(ria) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint Referred (42:1983)
Tue 07/02 8:26 AM
COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Benton County, Arkansas, Jeffrey Lehman, Austin Pinkston and Jorge Reyes, filed by Jesse James Rayburn.(ria) |