SEC Transportation, Inc.
Tennessee Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jimmy L Croom |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-10820 |
Case Filed: | Jul 02, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
SEC Transportation, Inc.
209 Reed Rd
Dyer, TN 38330-4030 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee One Memphis Place 200 Jefferson Avenue, Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38103 |
Docket last updated: 09/05/2024 12:03 PM CDT |
Saturday, August 24, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Sat 08/24 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 08/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
39 | 39
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Sat 08/24 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 08/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
court
Notice Of Deficient Claim
Thu 08/22 10:18 AM
Notification Of Deficient Claim RE: Claim 5 Filed By IRS due to Proof of claim was not filed with the court (lnm) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Small Business Monthly Operating Report
Mon 08/19 10:48 AM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 07/31/2024 Filed by Thomas Harold Strawn Jr. on behalf of Debtor SEC Transportation, Inc.. (Strawn, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Wed 08/14 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 08/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
35 | 35
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Wed 08/14 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 08/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
order
Agreed / Consent Order
Mon 08/12 10:06 AM
Consent Order Granting Filed by Thomas Harold Strawn Jr. on behalf of Debtor SEC Transportation, Inc. (srb) |
|
33 | 33
court
Notice Of Hearing - All Documents
Mon 08/12 8:16 AM
Notice Of Final Hearing; Final Hearing scheduled 9/5/2024 at 09:30 AM, Room 342, Jackson, TN . Bar Date For Objections - 8/27/2024. (dap) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
court
Minutes
Thu 08/08 1:00 PM
Minutes; Disposition: GRANTED WITHOUT OPPOSITION. Order to be prepared by Thomas Strawn. Notice Of PRELIMINARY Hearing; PRELIMINARY. Order due by 8/22/2024. (mjb ) Auto-docketed(CPA) |
||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Statement Of Operations
Wed 08/07 10:31 AM
Statement of Operations for Small Business Filed by Thomas Harold Strawn Jr. on behalf of Debtor SEC Transportation, Inc.. (Strawn, Thomas) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Fri 08/02 11:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 08/02/2024. (Admin.) |
|
30 | 30
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Fri 08/02 11:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 08/02/2024. (Admin.) |
|
29 | 29
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Fri 08/02 11:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 08/02/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Tax Returns
Wed 07/31 12:45 PM
Tax Returns Filed by Thomas Harold Strawn Jr. on behalf of Debtor SEC Transportation, Inc.. (Strawn, Thomas) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Cash Flow Statement
Wed 07/31 12:43 PM
Cash Flow Statement for Small Business Filed by Thomas Harold Strawn Jr. on behalf of Debtor SEC Transportation, Inc.. (Strawn, Thomas) |
|
26 | 26
court
Notice Of Hearing - All Documents
Wed 07/31 12:42 PM
Notice Of Hearing; Hearing scheduled 9/5/2024 at 09:30 AM, Room 342, Jackson, TN . Bar Date For Objections - 8/27/2024. (dap) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Balance Sheet
Wed 07/31 12:42 PM
Balance Sheet Filed by Thomas Harold Strawn Jr. on behalf of Debtor SEC Transportation, Inc.. (Strawn, Thomas) |
|
24 | 24
3
pgs
order
Order On Application To Employ
Wed 07/31 9:45 AM
Order Granting Application to Employ Greg Pillow (srb) |
|
23 | 23
3
pgs
order
Order On Application To Employ
Wed 07/31 9:41 AM
Order Granting Application to Employ Thomas Strawn (srb) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Adequate Protection
Tue 07/30 8:54 AM
Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Stephen L. Hughes on behalf of Centennial Bank (Hughes, Stephen) |
|
Sunday, July 28, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Sun 07/28 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/28/2024. (Admin.) |
|
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Sun 07/28 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/28/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
order
Case Management Order
Fri 07/26 1:29 PM
Case Management Order (srb) |
|
18 | 18
court
Notice Of Hearing - All Documents
Fri 07/26 9:14 AM
Notice Of PRELIMINARY Hearing; PRELIMINARY Hearing scheduled 8/8/2024 at 09:30 AM, Room 342, Jackson, TN . (dap) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Use Cash Collateral
Thu 07/25 1:19 PM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Thomas Harold Strawn Jr. on behalf of SEC Transportation, Inc. (Strawn, Thomas) |
|
utility
Order Due
Thu 07/25 10:58 AM
An Order GRANTING is to be filed by Thomas Strawn Order due by 8/8/2024. (dap) |
||
utility
Order Due
Thu 07/25 10:59 AM
An Order GRANTING is to be filed by Thomas Strawn Order due by 8/8/2024. (dap) |
||
court
Minutes
Thu 07/25 1:00 PM
Minutes; Disposition: CONDUCTED. Court to prepare the order. (dap ) Auto-docketed(CPA) |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
3
pgs
motion
Employ
Wed 07/24 9:14 AM
Application to Employ Greg Pillow as Accountant Filed by Thomas Harold Strawn Jr. on behalf of SEC Transportation, Inc. (Strawn, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit | ||
15 | 15
7
pgs
motion
Employ
Wed 07/24 8:26 AM
Application to Employ Thomas H. Strawn as Attorney Filed by Thomas Harold Strawn Jr. on behalf of SEC Transportation, Inc. (Strawn, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit | ||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
notice
Notice - GENERIC
Mon 07/22 10:03 AM
Notice In Compliance with Bankruptcy Rule 2019 Filed by Stephen L. Hughes on behalf of Centennial Bank, SIMMONS BANK (SEC Transportation, Inc.). (Hughes, Stephen) Modified on 7/22/2024 (srb) |
|
utility
Corrective Entry
Mon 07/22 10:47 AM
NOTICE OF CORRECTIVE ENTRY : (srb) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice Of Appearance And Request For Notice (For Attorney Filers ONLY)
Mon 07/15 2:16 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Stephen L. Hughes on behalf of Centennial Bank. (Hughes, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice Of Appearance And Request For Notice (For Attorney Filers ONLY)
Thu 07/11 10:21 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Stuart Wilson-Patton on behalf of TN Dept of Revenue. (Wilson-Patton, Stuart) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Declaration
Thu 07/11 12:11 PM
Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule C , Schedule D: Non-Individual Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual. , Schedule G: Non-Individual Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H: Non-Individual Codebtors , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor , Declaration re: Filed by Thomas Harold Strawn Jr. on behalf of Debtor SEC Transportation, Inc.. (Strawn, Thomas) |
|
utility
Satisfy Missing Document(s) Deadline
Thu 07/11 3:51 PM
All Completion/Missing Documents have been filed and all related deadlines have been satisfied. (srb) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Thu 07/11 12:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/10/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order And Notice Of Case Management Conference (initial order on ch11 cases)
Mon 07/08 9:58 AM
Order And Notice Of Case Management Conference Combined with Related Orders and Notice of the Entry Thereof Status hearing to be held on 7/25/2024 at 09:30 AM Room 342, Jackson, TN . (lnp) |
|
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Fri 07/05 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/05/2024. (Admin.) |
|
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Meeting Of Creditors
Fri 07/05 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 07/05/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice - GENERIC
Wed 07/03 3:27 PM
Notice of 11 U.S.C. Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Video Conference or Telephonic Conference Option Filed by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann) |
|
5 | 5
court
Meeting Of Creditors Chapter 11
Wed 07/03 10:42 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/29/2024 at 10:30 AM via by telephone or videoconference. Proof of Claims due by 10/28/2024. Government Proof of Claims due by 12/30/2024. (mjb) |
|
4 | 4
utility
Update Chapter 11 Deficiency Deadlines
Wed 07/03 9:20 AM
Notice of Required Filing Fee and/or Deficient Filing. Deficiency Deadlines Updated to Indicate Incomplete Filings: Attorney Fee Disclosure Statement, Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Statement of Financial Affairs and Debtor Declaration, Summary of Assets and Liabilities , Declaration Re: Corporation or Partnership (Form 202), Incomplete Filings Due by 7/17/2024. (lnm) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice Of Appearance And Request For Notice (For Attorney Filers ONLY)
Tue 07/02 4:30 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann) |
|
2 | 2
trustee
UST Notice Of Initial Debtor Interview
Tue 07/02 3:25 PM
As required by 28 U.S.C. Section 586(a), the United States Trustee provides notice that the Initial Debtor Interview will be held on Thursday, July 11, 2024, telephonically at 1:00 p.m. (Haynes, Sean) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Ch 11 - Atty Case Opening Only)
Tue 07/02 11:21 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual with deficiencies,. Filing Fee Due $1738, Filed by SEC Transportation, Inc. Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 12/30/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 12/30/2024. (Strawn, Thomas) |
|
misc
Matrix
Tue 07/02 11:21 AM
Matrix Filed by Thomas Harold Strawn Jr. on behalf of Debtor SEC Transportation, Inc.. (Strawn, Thomas) |
||
crditcrd
AutoDocket Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt
Tue 07/02 11:23 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-10820 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A41445228, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
trustee
U.S. Trustee Notice Setting Meeting Of Creditors
Tue 07/02 4:33 PM
Notice By The U.S. Trustee Setting The Meeting Of Creditors. Section 341 Meeting has been set on 7/29/2024 at 10:30 AM at via telephonic or video conference. (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann) |