Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-01214

Puerto Rico Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Maria De Los Angeles Gonzalez
Case #: 2:24-ap-00057
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
HECTOR LUIS COLON VEGA
CALLE CASTILLO 48 EDIFICIO ZAYAS PIZARRO APTO 3B
PONCE, PR 00731
Represented By
ATHOS VEGA DE JESUS, Jr
Athos Vega, Jr. Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
El Mirador Condominium Homeowners Association
2321 Calle Universidad
Ponce, PR 00717
Represented By
Javier A Rivera-Vaquer
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
15 15 misc Certificate of service Fri 04/11 12:36 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] Notice Date 04/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
14 14 misc Certificate of service Fri 04/11 12:36 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] Notice Date 04/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
13 13 order Judgment Tue 04/08 5:23 PM
JUDGMENT: Upon the order entered by the Honorable Maria de los Angeles Gonzalez on October 10, 2024, (Adv. Dkt. #10), and the order dismissing the lead bankruptcy case pursuant to PR LBR 7041-1 (Dkt. #44) on September 10, 2024, and it is now, ADJUDGED and DECREED judgment be and is hereby entered dismissing the instant adversary proceeding. Related [+]. Signed on 4/8/2025.(Muniz, Graciela)
Related: [-] 10
Saturday, October 12, 2024
12 12 misc Certificate of service Sun 10/13 12:34 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] Notice Date 10/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
11 11 misc Certificate of service Sun 10/13 12:34 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] Notice Date 10/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Thursday, October 10, 2024
10 10 order (Generic) Order Thu 10/10 5:00 PM
ORDER DISMISSING PROCEEDING: The captioned adversary proceeding is hereby dismissed without prejudice upon the dismissal of the lead case pursuant to PR LBR 7041-1.Clerk to enter judgment accordingly.IT IS SO ORDERED. Related [+]. Signed on 10/10/2024.(Muniz, Graciela)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Friday, August 16, 2024
9 9 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 08/16 11:46 AM
Summons Service Executed on HECTOR LUIS COLON VEGA 7/15/2024 (Rivera-Vaquer, Javier)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate of service Sat 08/03 12:36 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] Notice Date 08/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
7 7 order (Generic) Order Wed 07/31 11:03 AM
ORDER: The motion requesting order filed by the Chapter 13 Trustee (docket #6) is hereby granted as unopposed. Related [+]. Signed on 7/31/2024.(Diaz, Yolanda)
Related: [-] 6
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
6 6 motion Entry Of Order Wed 07/10 7:04 AM
Motion requesting entry of order Over Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Filed by Interested Party OSMARIE NAVARRO MARTINEZ ( objection language due by 07/24/2024). (SALWEN ACOSTA, MIRIAM)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, July 04, 2024
5 5 misc Certificate of service Fri 07/05 12:36 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] Notice Date 07/04/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
4 4 order Pretrial Conference Tue 07/02 12:01 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Hearing scheduled 10/15/2024 at 10:00 AM at Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. Signed on 7/2/2024.(Diaz, Yolanda)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons (Process Form) Tue 07/02 7:43 AM
Summons Issued Related [+]. (ROMO, JOSE)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, July 01, 2024
2 2 crditcrd Auto docket of credit card Mon 07/01 5:48 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-00057 MAG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16898995, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/01 5:46 PM
Adversary case 24-00057 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud): Complaint by El Mirador Condominium Homeowners Association against Hector Coln-Vega. Fee Amount $350 (Rivera-Vaquer, Javier)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet