Sand Castle Construction and Hardscape, LLC
New Hampshire Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kimberly Bacher |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-10460 |
Case Filed: | Jul 02, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Sand Castle Construction and Hardscape, LLC
PO Box 1946
Seabrook, NH 03874-1946 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
James C. Cleveland Building 53 Pleasant Street Suite 2300
Concord, NH 03301 |
Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago |
Saturday, August 31, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (ADI)
Sun 09/01 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 53. Notice Date 08/31/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
order
Continue/Schedule Hearing
Thu 08/29 2:09 PM
Order Continuing Hearing Signed on 8/29/2024 Status hearing to be held on 10/2/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom A. (So ordered by Judge Kimberly Bacher )(pptak) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Operating Report
Thu 08/15 4:55 PM
Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 2 - 31, 2024 Filed by Debtor Sand Castle Construction and Hardscape, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Pre-Status Conference Report (CH.11 - Subchapter V ONLY)
Tue 08/13 12:30 PM
Pre-Status Conference Report Filed by Debtor Sand Castle Construction and Hardscape, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
25 | 25
court
Reassignment of Case to Judge Kimberly Bacher (ADI)
Tue 08/13 10:51 AM
Reassignment of Case to Judge Kimberly Bacher. This reassignment is for internal purposes only and does not change the general reference of all bankruptcy cases by the U.S. District Court to the bankruptcy judges. Any hearing currently scheduled may be rescheduled. A separate notice will be issued if the hearing is rescheduled. Any papers filed in this matter shall display the initials KB after the case number and proposed orders should be drafted for Judge Bachers' signature. (kamadmin) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
trustee
341 Meeting of Creditors Held (ALL CHAPTERS - TRUSTEE/US TRUSTEE USE ONLY)
Thu 08/08 5:04 PM
341 Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded. Debtor(s) sworn. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee (Dirsa, Ann) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Receipt for Fees Paid via Credit/Debit Card (ADI)
Fri 08/02 2:48 PM
Receipt of Notice of Amendment to Petition/Schedules/Statements/List([LINK 24-10460 BAH] ) [misc,amdschd] ( 34.00) filing fee. Receipt number A4237313, Fee amount $ 34.00. . (U.S. Treasury) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Amendment to Petition/Schedules/Statements/List
Fri 08/02 2:43 PM
Notice of Amendment to Schedule E/F,List of Creditors, Fee Amount $ 34 Filed by Debtor Sand Castle Construction and Hardscape, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Amendment to Debtor's Schedules | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Amended Schedule F | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Amended Summary of Schedules | ||
Att: 4 List/Matrix of Parties Served | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Notice to Added Creditor | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Notice of Chapter 11 Case | ||
Att: 7 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (ADI)
Sat 07/27 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/26/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
order
Employ
Wed 07/24 4:17 PM
Order Granting Application to Employ. The Debtor, Sand Castle Construction and Hardscapes, LLC, is authorized to employ Eleanor Wm. Dahar, Esq. Signed on 7/24/2024. (So ordered by Judge Bruce A. Harwood ) (pptak) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
5
pgs
motion
Employ
Tue 07/16 4:12 PM
Ex Parte Application to Employ Eleanor Wm. Dahar, Esq. of Victor W. Dahar, P.A. as Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor Sand Castle Construction and Hardscape, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 2014 Statement of Attorney | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
18 | 18
misc
Declaration About Debtor Schedules - Form 106DEC
Tue 07/16 2:52 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor , Declaration About Debtors Schedules. , Equity Security Holders , Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G , Schedule H , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Sand Castle Construction and Hardscape, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (BK)
Mon 07/15 1:35 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jeremy R. Fischer Filed by Creditor Kennebunk Savings Bank (Fischer, Jeremy) |
|
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (ADI)
Sat 07/06 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 47. Notice Date 07/05/2024. (Admin.) |
|
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Notice (BK) (ADI)
Sat 07/06 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/05/2024. (Admin.) |
|
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors (ADI)
Sat 07/06 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. . No. of Notices: 48. Notice Date 07/05/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Wed 07/03 3:47 PM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/8/2024 at 02:00 PM via Telephonic Meeting of Creditors. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 10/7/2024. (cgg) |
|
12 | 12
trustee
Notice/Certificate Appointing Trustee (U.S. TRUSTEE ONLY)
Wed 07/03 3:01 PM
Notice/Certificate of Appointment of Trustee in a Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Case. James S. LaMontagne added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee (Dirsa, Ann) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
11 | 11
court
Notice to File Missing Documents (CH. 11)
Wed 07/03 10:28 AM
Notice to Debtor to File Schedules and Statements. Certain schedules and statements were not filed with the voluntary petition and are required to be filed by the date indicated under Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 1007 and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1007-1. Failure to file the documents required by 11 U.S.C. Section 521(a)(1) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1007-1 will result in the issuing of a Clerks Notice of Dismissal (Contingent). . Statement of Financial Affairs due by 7/16/2024. Schedule A/B due 7/16/2024. Schedule D due by 7/16/2024. Schedule E/F due 7/16/2024. Schedule G due by 7/16/2024. Schedule H due by 7/16/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 7/16/2024. Declaration re Debtor Schedules due by 7/16/2024. Atty Disclosure Statement due by 7/16/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due by 7/16/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 7/16/2024. (cgg) |
|
10 | 10
order
Status Conference/Hearing
Wed 07/03 10:18 AM
Order Setting a Status Conference/Hearing. See order for additional deadlines. Signed on 7/3/2024 Status hearing to be held on 8/28/2024 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom A. Pre-Status Report Due By 8/14/2024. Small Business Cash Flow Statement due by 7/9/2024. Small Business Balance Sheet due by 7/9/2024. Small Business Statement of Operations due by 7/9/2024. Tax return due by 7/9/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 9/10/2024. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 9/30/2024. (So ordered by Judge Bruce A. Harwood )(cgg) |
|
trustee
341 Meeting Date Set - Chapter 11 use ONLY
Wed 07/03 3:07 PM
Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 341(a) the United States Trustee has scheduled the meeting of creditors to take place on August 8, 2024 at 2:00 P.M. at the following location: The meeting will be telephonic. Please call (877) 954-4464 and use passcode 6404174#. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee (Dirsa, Ann) |
||
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
court
Case Assigned
Tue 07/02 4:40 PM
Judge Bruce A. Harwood assigned to case. (cgg) |
|
8 | 8
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Receipt for Fees Paid via Credit/Debit Card (ADI)
Tue 07/02 3:43 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11([LINK 24-10460 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A4227822, Fee amount $1738.00. . (U.S. Treasury) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Small Business Balance Sheet
Tue 07/02 3:38 PM
Small Business Balance Sheet Filed by Debtor Sand Castle Construction and Hardscape, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Small Business Statement of Operations
Tue 07/02 3:38 PM
Statement of Operations for Small Business Filed by Debtor Sand Castle Construction and Hardscape, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Small Business Cash Flow Statement
Tue 07/02 3:37 PM
Cash Flow Statement for Small Business Filed by Debtor Sand Castle Construction and Hardscape, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Tax Documents
Tue 07/02 3:35 PM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2022 Filed by Debtor Sand Castle Construction and Hardscape, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Debtor Organizational Documents
Tue 07/02 3:34 PM
Debtor Organizational Documents Filed by Debtor Sand Castle Construction and Hardscape, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Resolution
Tue 07/02 3:33 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Debtor Sand Castle Construction and Hardscape, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
1 | 1
15
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (CH. 11) (ACTIVE EVENT)
Tue 07/02 3:23 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Sand Castle Construction and Hardscape, LLC Incomplete Filings due by 07/16/2024. (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
utility
Update Government Proof of Claim
Tue 07/02 4:41 PM
Government Proof of Claim Deadline set. Government Proof of Claim due by 12/30/2024. (cgg) |