AmGuard Insurance Company v. White Cloud LLC
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Colleen R Lawless |
Referred: | Karen L Mcnaught |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-03179 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 02, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 17, 2024 7:03 AM CDT |
Defendant
White Cloud LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
AmGuard Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/18 9:06 AM
Summons Issued as to White Cloud LLC. Original summons returned to Plaintiff attorney for service. (KLC) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/16 4:35 PM
NOTICE Summons (Foster, Anne-Marie) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Fri 07/12 2:41 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 7/12/2024: The motion for leave3 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall file [Doc. [3-1] as Exhibit A to the Complaint1 . (KLC) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 07/11 11:20 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit A to the Complaint by Plaintiff AmGuard Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/25/2024(Foster, Anne-Marie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 07/03 8:40 AM
NOTICE (civil cover sheet) (Foster, Anne-Marie) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Attorney Complaint
Tue 07/02 4:22 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against White Cloud LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILCDC-4508866.), filed by AmGuard Insurance Company.(Foster, Anne-Marie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit C |