Gordon's Coatings, LLC
South Carolina Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Helen E Burris |
Case #: | 6:24-bk-02404 |
Case Filed: | Jul 02, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Gordon's Coatings, LLC
411 Blackberry Ln
Anderson, SC 29625-5801 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee's Office
Strom Thurmond Federal Building 1835 Assembly St. Suite 953
Columbia, SC 29201 |
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 12:02 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
court
Status Hearing Held
Thu 08/15 11:19 AM
Status Hearing Held. hb. (Baker, Leslie) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
order
TO - Remote Appearance
Tue 08/13 11:08 AM
Order Granting Request to Appear Remotely by Telephone. Listen Only. Contact the courtroom deputy for the information to appear remotely. Parties approved for remote appearance: Linda Barr. Related Document Number 17 Request to Appear Remotely filed by US Trustee's Office. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by: Chief Judge Helen E. Burris, US Bankruptcy Court - District of South Carolina . (Baker, Leslie) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Request to Appear Remotely (text only)
Tue 08/13 7:19 AM
Request to Appear Remotely by Telephone on August 15, 2024 Hearing, Slot Number 16 , re: Order Setting Status Conference (Subchapter V). The party(ies) requesting remote appearance are: Attorney.. Attorney representing: UST. The reason for the request is: listen only. The party's anticipated role is: Listen Only. Parties are expected to appear in person unless an order granting the request is entered on the docket. Filed by Linda Barr of Office of United States Trustee on behalf of US Trustee's Office . (Barr, Linda) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
trustee
Meeting of Creditors Held - Telephonic Meeting
Tue 08/06 2:51 PM
Telephonic Meeting of Creditors Held and Examination of Debtor on August 5, 2024. Filed by US Trustee's Office. (Barr, Linda) |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Schedules/Statements Filed
Wed 07/31 2:00 PM
Schedules Filed: Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedule A/B Schedule D Schedule E/F Schedule G Schedule H; Statements Filed: Statement of Financial Affairs Certification Verifying Creditor Matrix Official Form 202 - Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors for a Non-Individual Filed by Robert A. Pohl of POHL, P.A. on behalf of Gordon's Coatings, LLC. (Pohl, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
trustee
U.S. Trustees Statement - No Creditors Committee
Tue 07/30 1:09 PM
U.S. Trustee's Statement that No Creditors Committee has been appointed. Filed by US Trustee's Office. (Barr, Trustee Linda) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 07/25 4:44 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by Janet B. Haigler of Chapter 7 Panel Trustee on behalf of Janet B Haigler, Ch 7 Trustee for George A. Gordon. (Haigler, Janet) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
court
Certificate of Service BNC Document
Thu 07/25 12:23 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 07/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Extend Time
Mon 07/22 4:24 PM
Order Enlarging Time for Filing Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs and Other Documents Required Under 11 U.S.C. Section 521(a). New deadline 07/30/2024. . Document Served. (Barnello, P) Modified on 7/22/2024 to correct docket text (Barnello, P) |
|
Sunday, July 21, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury
Sun 07/21 3:39 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors Filed by Robert A. Pohl of POHL, P.A. on behalf of Gordon's Coatings, LLC. (Pohl, Robert) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extend Time (Not for use in Adversary cases)
Sun 07/21 3:36 PM
Motion to Extend Time To File Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs and other documents required under 11 USC Section 521(a) with Certificate of Service Filed by Robert A. Pohl of POHL, P.A. on behalf of Gordon's Coatings, LLC . (Pohl, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
court
Deficiency Notice (General)
Tue 07/09 10:05 AM
Deficiency Notice - Form 202 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors is required. re: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (atty) Deficiency Correction Due By: 7/19/2024 (Barnello, P) |
|
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
court
Certificate of Service BNC Document
Sat 07/06 12:22 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 07/05/2024. (Admin.) |
|
7 | 7
court
Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors
Sat 07/06 12:22 AM
Certificate of Service of Meeting of Creditors Notice as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 07/05/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Status Conference (Subchapter V)
Wed 07/03 4:40 PM
Order Setting Status Conference and Deadlines. Document Served. . Status Conference to be held on 8/15/2024 at 10:30 AM at Greenville. The case judge is Helen E. Burris. Pre-Status Report due by 8/1/2024. (Barnello, P) |
|
5 | 5
court
Meeting of Creditors
Wed 07/03 2:24 PM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors. Document Served. 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/5/2024 at 09:30 AM at Telephone - 341. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 10/4/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 9/10/2024. (Dillard, S) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Subchapter V)
Wed 07/03 1:18 PM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Subchapter V) Filed by US Trustee's Office . (Barr, Trustee Linda) |
|
trustee
Appointment of Trustee
Wed 07/03 1:14 PM
Appointment of Trustee: Christine Brimm added to the case. Filed by US Trustee's Office. (Barr, Trustee Linda) |
||
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Exhibit A
Tue 07/02 7:19 PM
Corporate Exhibit A, Filed by Robert A. Pohl of POHL, P.A. on behalf of Gordon's Coatings, LLC. . (Pohl, Robert) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing
Tue 07/02 7:04 PM
Debtor's Request to Decline Electronic Noticing. DOCUMENT IMAGE AVAILABLE ONLY TO COURT USERS AND THE TRUSTEE/US TRUSTEE. Filed by Robert A. Pohl of POHL, P.A. on behalf of Gordon's Coatings, LLC. (Pohl, Robert) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (atty)
Tue 07/02 7:03 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition SubchapterV Non-Individual Filed by Robert A. Pohl of POHL, P.A. on behalf of Gordon's Coatings, LLC. (Pohl, Robert) |
|
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet
Tue 07/02 7:16 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (atty)([LINK 24-02404 ) [misc,volp11ac] (1738.00). Receipt Number A13947464, amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |