New York Western District Court
Judge:Elizabeth A Wolford
Case #: 6:24-cv-06413
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 28, 2024 3:27 AM EST
Defendant
Barry Stuart Halajian
In care of: 4974 Fresno Street #290
Fresno, CA 93726
Plaintiff
Ace Funding Source, LLC


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
3 3 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Wed 01/08 4:47 PM
DECISION AND ORDER that Defendant file an amended notice of removal with the required documents attached within 30 days of the date of this Decision and Order. The failure to comply will result in remand of this case to state court. Defendant's2 Motion to Consolidate Cases is denied without prejudice. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 1/8/2025. (TF)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Wed 01/08 4:51 PM
Mailed Barry Stuart Halajian and Erica Gilerman a copy of #3 Decision and Order. (TF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
2 2 motion Consolidate Cases Tue 07/30 3:49 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Barry Stuart Halajian. (JHF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
utility Remark Wed 07/10 11:01 AM
ATTENTION ALL PARTIES OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and/or General Order No. 157 In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Disclosure Statements are to be filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (KM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Tue 07/02 9:17 AM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (TF)
Related: [-]
adr Automatic Referral to Mediation Tue 07/02 9:18 AM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's[LINK:ADR webpage] and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at[LINK:adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov] . Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the [LINK:ADR Plan] and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan.(TF)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 07/02 9:14 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Barry Stuart Halajian from MC Supreme Court, case number 2024008089., filed by Barry Stuart Halajian.(TF) (TF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (7/2/2024) envelope
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 07/02 9:16 AM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 600000883. (TF)
Related: [-]