Cottonwood Coffee, Inc.
South Dakota Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shon Hastings |
Case #: | 4:24-bk-40219 |
Case Filed: | Jul 02, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Cottonwood Coffee, Inc.
509 Main Ave
Brookings, SD 57006-1936 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
L. Ashley Wieck
Assistant U.S. Trustee 210 Walnut Street, Room 793
Des Moines, IA 50309 |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Saturday, August 31, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Sat 08/31 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice . Notice Date 08/31/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
order
Set Hearing/Deadlines
Thu 08/29 1:03 PM
Scheduling Order , submitted to BNC for service. Confirmation hearing to be held on 11/6/2024 at 02:00 PM (Central) (telephonic). Last day to object to confirmation 10/31/2024. (jlill) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
court
Hearing Minutes (new)
Wed 08/28 5:15 PM
Hearing Minutes re: . APPEARANCES: Clair R. Gerry for Debtor, Subchapter V Trustee Elizabeth M. Lally, Claire R. Davison for the United States Trustee and Creditor Stephanie Anderson. DISPOSITION: The Court will enter a Scheduling Order. (sstro) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
trustee
Statement of Conclusion
Wed 08/14 2:16 PM
Trustee's Statement of Conclusion. The meeting of creditors under 11 U.S.C. sec. 341 was concluded on 8/08/24 . (Wieck, L. Ashley) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Status Report
Mon 08/12 2:54 PM
Status Report filed by Cottonwood Coffee, Inc.. (Gerry, Clair) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
misc
List of Equity Security Holders
Thu 07/18 10:17 AM
List of Equity Security Holders. (Gerry, Clair) |
|
Saturday, July 13, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Sat 07/13 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice . Notice Date 07/13/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Thu 07/11 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice . Notice Date 07/11/2024. (Admin.) |
|
18 | 18
utility
Document Sent to BNC for Service
Thu 07/11 2:10 PM
Document Sent to BNC for Service . (dbohm) |
|
17 | 17
order
Employment of Attorney (text order)
Thu 07/11 2:07 PM
Order Approving Application for Employment of Gerry Law Firm, Prof. LLC (doc.8 ). The application is APPROVED subject to the limitations on compensation provided by 11 U.S.C. §328. This order is not a determination that the services or rates charged are necessary and reasonable. The person or entity employed under this order shall file a fee application in accordance with the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. See Fed.Rs.Bank.P. 2016, 2017 and 11 U.S.C. §§329, 330. The applicant must also comply with the local rules. SO ORDERED: /s/Shon Hastings, Bankruptcy Judge. (text order only). (dbohm) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Wed 07/10 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice . Notice Date 07/10/2024. (Admin.) |
|
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Wed 07/10 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice . Notice Date 07/10/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
order
Set Hearing/Deadlines
Mon 07/08 2:36 PM
Order Setting Deadline for Debtor to File Report Under 11 U.S.C. § 1188(c) and Setting Telephonic Status Conference Under 11 U.S.C. § 1188(a) , submitted to BNC for service. Status Conference scheduled for 8/28/2024 at 02:30 PM (Central) (telephonic). Report due 8/14/2024. (msemm) |
|
13 | 13
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Mon 07/08 2:05 PM
For Non-Individual Chapter 11 Cases: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders. (Gerry, Clair) |
|
12 | 12
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Mon 07/08 2:03 PM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, submitted to BNC for service. 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/8/2024 at 02:00 PM via 341 telephonic meeting - Chapter 11. Last day to oppose dischargeability 10/7/2024. Proofs of Claim due 9/9/2024. (msemm) |
|
11 | 11
trustee
Notice Appointing Trustee
Mon 07/08 1:49 PM
U.S. Trustee's Notice of Appointment of Trustee Elizabeth M. Lally. (Wieck, L. Ashley) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)
Mon 07/08 1:15 PM
Withdrawal of . Pursuant to Bankr. D.S.D. R. 9014-2, Clair R. Gerry withdraws the above-named document(s) and certifies that parties in interest who will not be served electronically have been advised of the withdrawal. (Gerry, Clair) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 07/03 12:30 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Claire Davison filed on behalf of L. Ashley Wieck. (Davison, Claire) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
motion
Employment of Attorney
Tue 07/02 5:11 PM
Application to Employ Gerry Law Firm, Prof. LLC filed by Cottonwood Coffee, Inc.. Objections due 07/9/2024. (Gerry, Clair) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
7 | 7
misc
Debtor(s) Statement Regarding Business Records
Tue 07/02 5:10 PM
Debtor(s) Statement Regarding Business Records Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 1116(1) filed by Cottonwood Coffee, Inc..(Gerry, Clair) |
|
Att: 1 Balance Sheet | ||
Att: 2 Cash Flow Statement | ||
Att: 3 Federal Tax Return | ||
6 | 6
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Tue 07/02 4:50 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed by Cottonwood Coffee, Inc. . (Gerry, Clair) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Tue 07/02 4:43 PM
Disclosure of Compensation filed by Attorney for Debtor(s). (Gerry, Clair) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Statement of Authority to File - Ch 11
Tue 07/02 4:24 PM
Statement of Authority to File filed by Cottonwood Coffee, Inc..(Gerry, Clair) |
|
Att: 1 Minutes of special meeting | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Internet Payment
Tue 07/02 4:15 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-40219 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee (doc.1 ). Receipt Number A3792395, Filing Fee Amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Tue 07/02 4:12 PM
For Non-Individual Chapter 11 Cases: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders. (Gerry, Clair) |
|
1 | 1
43
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 07/02 4:06 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals filed by Clair R. Gerry of Gerry Law Firm, Prof. LLC on behalf of Cottonwood Coffee, Inc. (fee due of $1738.00). Plan due by 09/30/2024. (Gerry, Clair) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Tue 07/02 4:13 PM
Judge Shon Hastings added to case. (msemm) |
||
utility
Update Deadline(s) Public Event
Tue 07/02 5:02 PM
Deadline(s) Updated . List of Equity Security Holders due 7/16/2024. Small Business Statement Re: Business Records due 7/16/2024. (msemm) |