AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP v. Ellison
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Patrick J Schiltz |
Referred: | Leo I Brisbois |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02621 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s) |
Case Filed: | Jul 02, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 03, 2024 1:40 AM CDT |
Defendant
Keith Ellison
St. Paul, MN 55101
|
|
Plaintiff
AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/04/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney
Wed 07/03 7:44 AM
(Text-Only) Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Allon Kedem, Jeffrey L. Handwerker, Stephen K. Wirth, Samuel I. Ferenc as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (MKB) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/03 7:41 AM
Summons Issued as to Keith Ellison. (MKB) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Wed 07/03 7:40 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 24-cv-2621 (PJS/LIB). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/02 7:01 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Dixon, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
41
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/02 6:57 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Keith Ellison (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11171530) filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Filer requests summons issued. (Dixon, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |