Joyce Harris v. 3M Company Inc
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03816 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 02, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 17, 2024 9:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Joyce Harris
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 07/03 7:46 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 07/02/2024), Joyce Harris v. 3M Company Inc, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03816-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern Alabama (mbon) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/03 7:44 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mbon) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
33
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/03 7:43 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11857373.), filed by Joyce Harris. Service due by 9/30/2024 (mbon) |