Jesse Gonzales v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03824 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 03, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 30, 2024 3:58 AM EST |
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corp
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corp
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Co
|
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corp
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corp
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Co
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corp
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corp
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Jesse Gonzales
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Eric Jaramillo, Lee Macpherson, Daniel Lorch, Sipriano Romero, Carol Gercke, Darrell Keith Austin, Lisel Ferguson, Morris Gutierrez, David Rettinger, John Brown, Jeffrey Jones, Douglas Peters, Karl Becker, Benjamin Dimas, III, Candice Lopez, Marco Lopez, Jesse Gonzales, Willie Telles Without Prejudice as to Personal Injury Claims Only (Rodriguez, Christopher) Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al. Refiled by clerk correctly as of original filing date per attorney filing user inadvertently misfiled in shell case, as confirmed and provided by filing user (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 07/03 11:16 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 07/03/2024), Jesse Gonzales v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03824-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: New Mexico (mbon) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mbon) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11858446.), filed by Jesse Gonzales. Service due by 10/1/2024 (mbon) |