AEL Investment Group, LLC
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Corali Lopez-Castro |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-16739 |
Case Filed: | Jul 03, 2024 |
Claims Deadline: | Sep 11, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
AEL Investment Group, LLC
10220 SW 129th St
Miami, FL 33176-5641 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
84 | 84
order
Extend Time Order
Fri 09/06 2:33 PM
Agreed Order Granting Motion to Extend Deadline to 9/19/2024 to Respond to Document Discovery (Olivier, Mike) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
83 | 83
ordertext
Order Granting (TEXT ONLY)
Thu 09/05 2:31 PM
Order Granting 82 Ex Parte Motion For Leave To Appear Remotely on 9/5/2024 at 01:30 filed by Trustee Aleida Martinez-Molina. Movant is directed to serve copies of this text-only order upon required parties and file a certificate of service with the court pursuant to Local Rule 2002-1(F). SO ORDERED by Judge Corali Lopez-Castro . (**This is a text-only order with no underlying PDF image entered pursuant to Local Rule 5005-4(F) and Local Rule 9021-1(A)**). (Gutierrez, Susan) |
|
82 | 82
motion
Appear Remotely (Ex Parte)
Thu 09/05 1:28 PM
Ex Parte Motion For Leave To Appear Remotely on 9/5/2024 at 01:30 ] Filed by Trustee Aleida Martinez-Molina (Martinez-Molina, Aleida) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
81 | 81
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 09/04 5:15 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Macon Center LLC . (Hartsell, Gabriel) |
|
80 | 80
order
Appear at Hearing Remotely Order
Wed 09/04 2:16 PM
Order Granting Macon Center LLC's Ex Parte Motion To Appear Virtually at the Subchapter V Status Conference. (Gutierrez, Susan) |
|
79 | 79
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 09/04 10:28 AM
Notice of Filing Plan Liquidation Analysis , Filed by Debtor AEL Investment Group, LLC . (Pendergraft, Eric) |
|
78 | 78
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 09/04 9:41 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Phancy Silk Flowers, Inc. . (Rappaport, Jordan) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
77 | 77
motion
Extend Time
Tue 09/03 5:47 PM
Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Document Discovery Filed by Debtor AEL Investment Group, LLC (Pendergraft, Eric) |
|
76 | 76
plan
Chapter 11 Plan [Small Business Subchapter V]
Tue 09/03 5:15 PM
Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan Filed by Debtor AEL Investment Group, LLC. (Shraiberg, Bradley) |
|
75 | 75
order
Appear at Hearing Remotely Order
Tue 09/03 8:33 AM
Order Granting Creditor Phancy Silk Flowers, Inc.'s Ex-Parte Motion To Appear at Hearing Remotely at the Subchapter V Status Conference Scheduled for September 5, 2024. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
74 | 74
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service
Fri 08/30 1:13 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Nathan Allan Wheatley Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Wheatley, Nathan) |