The People of the State of California, acting by and through the Los Angeles City Attorney et al v. 3M Company aka Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03822 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 03, 2024 |
Case in other court: | California Central, 2:24-cv-04545 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 17, 2024 9:33 AM EDT |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
individually and as successor in interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C.
individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Dupont De Nemours And Company NKA EIDP, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Fire and Security Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Fire and Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Ciba Inc. 100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
The City of Los Angeles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The People of the State of California
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/22 5:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P Mensher on behalf of The City of Los Angeles, The People of the State of California (Mensher, Daniel) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/22 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Mary McCallum on behalf of The City of Los Angeles, The People of the State of California (McCallum, Kathryn) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/22 5:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Gaffney on behalf of The City of Los Angeles, The People of the State of California (Gaffney, Alison) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/22 5:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gretchen Freeman Cappio on behalf of The City of Los Angeles, The People of the State of California (Freeman Cappio, Gretchen) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 07/03 1:58 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: California Central (associated as of 7/3/2024), 2:24-cv-04545, The People of the State of California, acting by and through the Los Angeles City Attorney et al v. 3M Company aka Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03822-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
15 | 15
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 07/03 1:56 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:24-cv-04545. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
14 | 14 Conditional Transfer Order - 196 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2873, transferring case to USDC, District of South Carolina and assigned to Honorable Richard M. Gergel. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2024.] | |
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
13 | 13 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. See order for details. (ys) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2024.] | |
Tuesday, June 04, 2024 | ||
12 | 12 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT11 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. All defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise plead to the Complaint twenty-eight (28) days after the JPML issues a decision on whether to transfer this action to MDL No. 2873, In re: Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2024.] | |
Monday, June 03, 2024 | ||
11 | 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint - (Discovery),,, filed by defendant Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP.(Cosgrove, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 31, 2024 | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kathryn M. McCallum on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2024.] | |
9 | 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Alison S Gaffney on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2024.] | |
8 | 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Daniel P Mensher on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2024.] | |
7 | 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Gretchen Freeman Cappio on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2024.] | |
6 | 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2024.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2024.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2024.] | |
3 | 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP, identifying Johnson Control International plc. (Cosgrove, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2024.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Cosgrove, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA, County of Los Angeles, case number 24STCV09939 Receipt No: ACACDC-37568347 - Fee: $405, filed by defendant Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attorney Ryan E. Cosgrove added to party Chemguard, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan E. Cosgrove added to party Tyco Fire Products LP(pty:dft))(Cosgrove, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint | ||
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants 3M Company, AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc., Archroma U.S., Inc., Arkema Inc., BASF Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Carrier Fire and Security Americas Corporation, Carrier Fire and Security Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, Chemdesign Products Inc., Chemguard, Inc., Chemicals Incorporated, Clariant Corporation, Corteva, Inc., Deepwater Chemicals, Inc., DuPont De Nemours Inc., Dynax Corporation, E.I. Dupont De Nemours And Company NKA EIDP, Inc., John Doe Defendants 1-20, Nation Ford Chemical Company, National Foam, Inc., The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Tyco Fire Products LP. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs The City of Los Angeles, The People of the State of California. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/19/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2024.] |