Higher Heights Learning Academy
Member Case
Lead case is: 3:24-bk-12156
Lead case is: 3:24-bk-12156
Arkansas Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Phyllis M Jones |
Case #: | 3:24-bk-12191 |
Case Filed: | Jul 03, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Higher Heights Learning Academy
3006 S Caraway Rd
Jonesboro, AR 72401-7308 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee (ust)
Office Of U. S. Trustee 200 W Capitol, Ste. 1200
Little Rock, AR 72201 |
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 12:00 PM CDT |
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
court
Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched
Fri 09/13 4:32 PM
Status Conference Hearing SCHEDULED (OUT OF DIVISION) Hearing scheduled for 9/26/2024 at 01:30 PM at Phyllis Jones' Little Rock Courtroom. (Johnson, Y) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 08/23 6:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailin No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/22/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Authority
Tue 08/20 2:10 PM
Order Approving Motion to Escrow Funds for Advance Fees and Expenses for Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee Entered on Docket 8/20/2024 (Bell, Allison) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 08/14 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Application to Employ
Mon 08/12 12:59 PM
Order Approving Application to Employ Attorney for Debtor Entered on Docket 8/12/2024 (Acred, Hannah) |
|
Saturday, August 10, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
Sat 08/10 11:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearin No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/10/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
court
Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched
Thu 08/08 3:11 PM
Evidentiary Hearing CONTINUED (OUT OF DIVISION) PARTIES REQUESTED & AGREED. Hearing scheduled for 8/22/2024 at 01:30 PM at Phyllis Jones' Little Rock Courtroom. (Johnson, Y) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
Wed 07/31 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearin No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/31/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
court
Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched
Mon 07/29 10:22 AM
Evidentiary Hearing SCHEDULED (OUT OF DIVISION) Hearing scheduled for 8/22/2024 at 09:30 AM at Phyllis Jones' Little Rock Courtroom. (Johnson, Y) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 11)
Wed 07/17 2:52 PM
Schedules Filed: Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Sch A/B, Sch G, Sch H, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtor, Stmt of Financial Affairs, [Fee Due No] Filed by William F Godbold IV on behalf of Debtor Higher Heights Learning Academy (Godbold, William) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Corporate Resolution
Wed 07/17 1:05 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by William F Godbold IV on behalf of Debtor Higher Heights Learning Academy (Godbold, William) |
|
Saturday, July 13, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 07/13 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/13/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
court
Public Docket Remark (Chambers ONLY)
Thu 07/11 12:54 PM
Docket Remark: An order has been entered in this case directing theprocedural consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter11 cases of JWs at the Mallard, LLC and Higher Heights LearningAcademy. The docket in the chapter 11 case of JWs at the Mallard,LLC should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (Acred, Hannah) |
|
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion For Joint Administration
Thu 07/11 12:53 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case 3:24-bk-12156 with Member Case 3:24-bk-12191 Entered on Docket 7/11/2024 (Acred, Hannah) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Wed 07/10 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditor No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/10/2024. (Admin.) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Employ (Motion)
Wed 07/10 9:18 AM
Amended Application to Employ Attorney for Debtor Filed by William F Godbold IV on behalf of Higher Heights Learning Academy (Godbold, William) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
10 | 10
misc
Small Business Balance Sheet
Wed 07/10 9:16 AM
Small Business Balance Sheet, Small Business Cash Flow Statement , Small Business Statement of Operations Filed by William F Godbold IV on behalf of Debtor Higher Heights Learning Academy (Godbold, William) |
|
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 07/05 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/05/2024. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
trustee
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (UST)
Fri 07/05 4:56 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/1/2024 at 10:30 AM at Ch. 11 Tele-Meeting of Creditors. Last day to oppose dischargeability is 9/30/2024. (Johnson, Kent) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Authority
Fri 07/05 4:32 PM
Motion for Authority to Escrow Funds for Advance Fees and Expenses for Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee and Notice of Opportunity to Object Filed by Beverly I Brister on behalf of Beverly I Brister (Brister, Beverly) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Opportunity to Object | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice Appointing Ch. 11 Subchapter V Trustee
Fri 07/05 4:23 PM
Notice Appointing Ch. 11 Subchapter V Trustee(Sherman, Shari) |
|
Att: 1 Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee | ||
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
misc
Order of Deficiency
Wed 07/03 2:50 PM
Order of Deficiency Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 7/17/2024. Schedules-Documents due 7/17/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/17/2024. Corporate Resolution due 7/17/2024. Small Business Statement of Operations due 7/10/2024Small Business Balance Sheet due: 7/10/2024 Federal Income Tax Return Date: 7/10/2024. Small Business Cash Flow Statement due 7/10/2024 (Bell, Allison) |
|
4 | 4
5
pgs
motion
Joint Administration (Motion)
Wed 07/03 1:08 PM
Emergency Motion for Joint Administration Filed by William F Godbold IV on behalf of Higher Heights Learning Academy (Godbold, William) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Employ (Motion)
Wed 07/03 1:05 PM
Application to Employ Attorney for Debtor Filed by William F Godbold IV on behalf of Higher Heights Learning Academy (Godbold, William) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Receipt (Auto)
Wed 07/03 1:01 PM
RECEIPT of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:3:24-bk-12191] ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. receipt number A16229657, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
15
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 07/03 12:56 PM
Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Higher Heights Learning Academy. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 10/1/2024. (Godbold, William) |