Mr. Knickerbocker, Inc.
South Carolina Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Helen E Burris |
Case #: | 6:24-bk-02433 |
Case Filed: | Jul 05, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Mr. Knickerbocker, Inc.
PO Box 1682
Clemson, SC 29633-1682 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee's Office
Strom Thurmond Federal Building 1835 Assembly St. Suite 953
Columbia, SC 29201 |
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 12:02 PM EDT |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
79 | 79
misc
Notice of Change of Address - No PDF Required
Fri 08/30 2:34 PM
Notice of Change of Address. CREDITOR to be changed: Stenson Tamaddo, LLC, 1 N Central Ave.,, Phoenix, AZ 85004 CORRECTED CREDITOR INFORMATION: Stenson Tamaddo, LLC, 1 N Central Avenue, Suite 1030, Phoenix, AZ 85004 Filed by William Harrison Penn of Penn Law Firm, LLC on behalf of Mr. Knickerbocker, Inc.. (Penn, William) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
78 | 78
motion
Relief from Stay
Mon 08/26 12:26 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay, Hearing Notice and Certificate of Service RE: 384 College Ave, Clemson SC. Filed by Jacob S. Barker of Graybill, Lansche & Vinzani, LLC on behalf of Acre - Clemson, LLC. Date Served 8/26/2024. Last day for objections is 9/9/2024. Hearing scheduled for 9/24/2024 at 10:30 AM at Greenville. (Barker, Jacob) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ledger | ||
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet
Mon 08/26 12:27 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK 24-02433 hb] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A14020937, amount 199.00. (U.S. Treasury) |