Obah v. ADAPT
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jesse M Furman |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-05014 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices) |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 06, 2024 4:19 AM EDT |
Defendant
ADAPT
|
|
Plaintiff
Patrick C. Obah
820 Saint Ann's Avenue Apt. 8H
Bronx, NY 10456 |
Docket last updated: 07/21/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
misc
Mailing Receipt
Wed 07/17 10:13 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 6. Mailed to: Patrick C. Obah 820 Saint Ann's Avenue Apt. 8H Bronx, NY 10456. (vn) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
5
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Mon 07/15 10:56 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court dismisses Plaintiff's Title VII claim for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted, 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), and declines supplement jurisdiction of his state law claims. The Court grants Plaintiff leave to submit an amended complaint within thirty days of the date of this Memorandum Opinion and Order. An Amended Complaint for Employment Discrimination form is attached to this order. If Plaintiff files an amended complaint, he must label it with docket number 24-CV-5014 (JMF). No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint within the time allowed, the Court will direct the Clerk of Court to enter judgment in this matter. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Memorandum Opinion and Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status isdenied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962).The Court directs the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this Memorandum Opinion and Order to Plaintiff. The case should remain open pending the deadline to submit an amended complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/15/24) (yv) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
misc
Mailing Receipt
Thu 07/11 11:03 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 5. Mailed to: Patrick C. Obah 820 Saint Ann's Avenue Apt. 8H Bronx, NY 10456. (rdz) |
||
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Granting IFP Application
Wed 07/10 9:13 AM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/3/2024) (vn) |
|
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Wed 07/03 12:08 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 07/03 12:09 PM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vba) |
||
misc
Mailing Receipt
Wed 07/03 12:19 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: Patrick C. Obah 820 Saint Ann's Avenue Apt. 8H Bronx, NY 10456. (tro) |
||
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Standing Order re Cases Filed By Pro Se Plaintiffs
Tue 07/02 9:42 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE CASES FILED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFFS (See 24-MISC-127 Standing Order filed March 18, 2024). To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a party's obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information. Parties may[LINK:consent to electronic service] to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for[LINK:permission to file documents electronically] . Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the court's electronic docket. A notice directing the parties' attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the court's records. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/18/2024) (sac) |
|
service
Note Regarding Service on Self-Represented Party
Tue 07/02 9:43 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT NOTE: For each electronic filing made in a case involving a self-represented party who has not consented to electronic service, the filing party must serve the document on such self-represented party in a manner permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2) (other than through the ECF system) and file proof of service for each document so served. Please see[LINK:Rule 9.2] of the courts ECF Rules & Instructions for further information. (sac) |
||
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/02 9:28 AM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Patrick C. Obah.(sac) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/02 9:27 AM
COMPLAINT against ADAPT. Document filed by Patrick C. Obah. (sac) |
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 07/02 9:29 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sac) |