Sun v. Garland et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rachel P Kovner |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-04722 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1651 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 22, 2024 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
US Attorney General Merrick B. Garland
US Attorney General 950 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20530 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Director Patricia A. Menges
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mei Chai Sun
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 08/19 11:41 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The7 stipulation of dismissal is so-ordered. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 08/19/2024. (AC) |
||
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 08/16 1:37 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Patricia A. Menges (Bashyrov, Jacob) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance Immigration/Social Security Cases
Fri 08/16 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A Bashyrov on behalf of Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Patricia A. Menges (aty to be noticed) (Bashyrov, Jacob) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance Immigration/Social Security Cases
Tue 07/23 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by OFFICE OF IMMIGRATION LITIGATION - GENERIC on behalf of Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Patricia A. Menges (aty to be noticed) (OFFICE OF IMMIGRATION LITIGATION - GENERIC, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Tue 07/09 3:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mei Chai Sun. Merrick B. Garland served on 7/9/2024, answer due 9/9/2024; Alejandro Mayorkas served on 7/9/2024, answer due 9/9/2024; Patricia A. Menges served on 7/9/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. (Gu, Wei) |
|
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 07/09 9:58 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference will be held by telephone before Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 10/9/2024 at 11:00 AM. The parties are directed to call (571) 353-2301 and type in the access code 070896324 to join the conference. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 7/9/2024. (SP) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 07/08 10:48 AM
Summons Issued as to Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Patricia A. Menges, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (KD) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 07/08 10:46 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/08 10:24 AM
COMPLAINT against Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Patricia A. Menges filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18044491 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Mei Chai Sun. (Gu, Wei) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 07/08 10:45 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD) |