Fleming v. Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel P Jordan, III |
Referred: | Andrew S Harris |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00392 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Case in other court: | The Circuit Court of Hinds County, MS, 25CI1:24-cv-375-DHG |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 22, 2024 3:31 AM CDT |
Defendant
Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca Fleming
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
discov
Notice of Service of Disclosure
Fri 08/30 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Service of Disclosure by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Heidelberg, Cecil) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Rule 16(a) Initial Order
Fri 08/09 10:41 AM
Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to harris_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
respoth
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Mon 07/08 3:49 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Heidelberg, Cecil) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 07/08 10:02 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company from The Circuit Court of Hinds County, MS, case number 25CI1:24-cv-375-DHG. (Filing fee $ 405 paid; receipt number AMSSDC-5444622) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (ND) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court File, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |