Bian v. Garland et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Pamela K Chen |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-04725 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1651 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 22, 2024 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
US Attorney General Merrick Garland
Attorney General of the United States of America US Department of Justice 950 Pennslvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro N Mayorkas
Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security DHS, 2707 Martin Luther King Jr Ave SE
Washington, DC 20528 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Director Patricia A. Menges
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Xin Jie Bian
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 08/15 1:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Merrick Garland, Alejandro N Mayorkas, Patricia A. Menges (Bashyrov, Jacob) |
|
order
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 08/15 1:24 PM
Civil Case Terminated. See8 Voluntary Dismissal. (FG) |
||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance Immigration/Social Security Cases
Mon 08/12 4:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A Bashyrov on behalf of Merrick Garland, Alejandro N Mayorkas, Patricia A. Menges (aty to be noticed) (Bashyrov, Jacob) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance Immigration/Social Security Cases
Tue 07/23 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by OFFICE OF IMMIGRATION LITIGATION - GENERIC on behalf of Merrick Garland, Alejandro N Mayorkas, Patricia A. Menges (aty to be noticed) (OFFICE OF IMMIGRATION LITIGATION - GENERIC, ) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause (Federal)
Thu 07/11 4:53 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The United States Attorney, as attorney for Defendants, is directed to show cause on or before 9/9/2024, in writing, why a writ of mandamus should not be issued, and shall serve a copy of the response on Plaintiff, with proof of such service to the Clerk of this Court. On or before 10/9/2024, Plaintiff shall file a reply, if any, with proof of service to the Clerk of Court. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 7/11/2024. Electronic Service upon the US Attorneys Office re1 Complaint. (FG) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Tue 07/09 3:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xin Jie Bian. Merrick Garland served on 7/9/2024, answer due 9/9/2024; Alejandro N Mayorkas served on 7/9/2024, answer due 9/9/2024; Patricia A. Menges served on 7/9/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. (Gu, Wei) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 07/08 12:53 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/08 12:53 PM
Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland, Alejandro N Mayorkas, Patricia A. Menges. (SDM) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/08 10:46 AM
COMPLAINT against Merrick Garland, Alejandro N Mayorkas, Patricia A. Menges filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18044733 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Xin Jie Bian. (Gu, Wei) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons |