Delaware District Court
Judge:John F Murphy
Case #: 1:24-cv-00791
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:1 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 3:45 AM EST
Defendant
Intellia Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By
Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Derek James Fahnestock
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BlueAllele Corporation
Represented By
Michael J. Kane
contact info
Brandon M. Schwartz
contact info
Jon Bell
Fish & Richardson
contact info
Jonathan E. Singer
contact info
Dexter Whitley
contact info
Warren K. Mabey, Jr.
Fish & Richardson, P.C.
contact info
AnnaMartina Tyreus Hufnal
Fish & Richardson, P.C.
contact info
J. Patrick Finn, Ph.D., J.D., III
contact info
J. Patrick Finn, Ph.D., J.D. III
contact info
Sarah E. Jack
contact info

GPO Dec 09 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge John F. Murphy on 12/9/2024. (mpb)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
87 87 discov Notice of Service Mon 04/21 5:18 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Intellia's Responses and Objections to BlueAllele's Second Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 46-82) and (2) Intellia's Responses and Objections to BlueAllele's Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 9-12) - filed by Intellia Therapeutics, Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
Related: [-]