Bryant v. The Louisiana Community and Technical College System et al
Louisiana Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Brian A Jackson |
Referred: | Richard L Bourgeois, Jr |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00547 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 22, 2024 3:27 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bossier Parish Community College
|
|
Defendant
The Louisiana Community and Technical College System
|
|
Plaintiff
Josephine Bryant
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 09/10 1:56 PM
ORDER granting12 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Defendant The Louisiana Community and Technical College System is granted an extension of 21 days from the date of this Order to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/10/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) |
||
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Substitute Pleading (In Order to Correct Deficiency)
Mon 09/09 3:28 PM
MOTION to Substitute13 Certificate of Interested Persons by The Louisiana Community and Technical College System(MuseVincent, Lesley) (Attachment 2 replaced to flatten document and edited docket text on 9/9/2024) (JEG) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Proposed substitution Signed Cert. of Interested Persons | ||
13 | 13
notice
Certificate of Interested Persons
Mon 09/09 1:43 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by The Louisiana Community and Technical College System identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Office of Risk Management, Affiliate/Interested Person Louisiana Community and Technical College System, Affiliate/Interested Person Louisiana Attorney General's Office for The Louisiana Community and Technical College System. (MuseVincent, Lesley) (Main Document 13 replaced on 9/9/2024 to flatten document) (JEG) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 09/09 1:34 PM
Ex-Parte MOTION for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleadings by The Louisiana Community and Technical College System(MuseVincent, Lesley) Modified on 9/9/2024 to edit title of document and to remove duplicate description of attachment. (JEG) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 09/09 10:15 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Josephine Bryant. Bossier Parish Community College served on 8/21/2024, answer due 9/11/2024; The Louisiana Community and Technical College System served on 9/4/2024, answer due 9/25/2024. (Lospennato, Ronald) |
|
utility
Motion(s) Referred
Mon 09/09 2:46 PM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:12 Ex-Parte MOTION for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG) |
||
utility
Motion(s) Referred
Mon 09/09 3:50 PM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:14 MOTION to Substitute13 Certificate of Interested Persons . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG) |
||
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 08/29 1:36 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bossier Parish Community College(MuseVincent, Lesley) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading; proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Enroll as Attorney
Tue 08/27 9:27 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. Attorney Lesley Chanel MuseVincent is enrolled as counsel for defendant Bossier Parish Community College. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/27/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 08/27 9:50 AM
ORDER granting6 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Defendant Bossier Parish Community College is granted an extension of 21 days from the date of this Order to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/27/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) |
||
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Certificate of Interested Persons
Fri 08/23 3:33 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Bossier Parish Community College identifying Affiliate/Interested Person State of Louisiana, Risk Management, Affiliate/Interested Person Attorney General Office, Affiliate/Interested Person Bossier Parish Community College for Bossier Parish Community College.. (MuseVincent, Lesley) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 08/23 2:39 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Bossier Parish Community College(MuseVincent, Lesley) Modified on 8/23/2024 to edit title of document and to remove duplicate description of attachment. (JEG) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
motion
Enroll as Attorney
Fri 08/23 2:16 PM
MOTION to Enroll Lesley C. Muse Vincent as Attorney by Bossier Parish Community College(MuseVincent, Lesley) Modified on 8/23/2024 to remove duplicate description of attachment. (JEG) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
utility
Motion(s) Referred
Fri 08/23 4:54 PM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:5 MOTION to Enroll Lesley C. Muse Vincent as Attorney ,6 First MOTION for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleadings. These motions are now pending before the USMJ. (JEG) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
90 Day Conference Order
Thu 07/18 6:27 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: A Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 9/26/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 9/12/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/18/2024. (SGO) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/09 9:58 AM
Summons Issued as to Bossier Parish Community College, The Louisiana Community and Technical College System. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.)(EDC) |
|
Att: 1 summons | ||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Persons
Mon 07/08 10:59 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Josephine Bryant identifying Corporate Parent Bossier Parish Community College, Corporate Parent The Louisiana Community and Technical College System for Josephine Bryant.. (Lospennato, Ronald) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Complete Case Opening First)
Mon 07/08 10:54 AM
COMPLAINT against Bossier Parish Community College, The Louisiana Community and Technical College System ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAMDC-2773339.), filed by Josephine Bryant.(Lospennato, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit List Exhibit List, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 Expulsion Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 2 Grievance, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 3 Accom Request, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. 4 Accom Denial, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. 5 Grievance Decision, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. 6 Grievance Appeal, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. 7 Appeal Decision, | ||
Att: 9 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 10 Attachment Summons BPCC, | ||
Att: 11 Attachment Summons LCTCS |