Rubinstein v. Rardin
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Brandy R Mcmillion |
Referred: | Elizabeth A Stafford |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-11746 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Petitioner
Jacob Mathias Rubinstein
|
|
Respondent
Eric Rardin
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
appeal
Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit*
Mon 07/29 12:04 PM
Certificate of Service re6 Notice of Appeal. (TTho) |
|
6 | 6
appeal
Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit
Mon 07/29 12:04 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Jacob Mathias Rubinstein re5 Judgment. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. (TTho) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Judgment*
Mon 07/15 11:20 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos) |
|
4 | 4
7
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion & Order
Mon 07/15 11:18 AM
OPINION AND ORDER SUMMARILY DENYING THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS BROUGHT PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 2241 AND GRANTING PETITIONER LEAVE TO APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos) |
|
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 07/15 11:21 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re4 Memorandum Opinion & Order,5 Judgment mailed to Jacob Mathias Rubinstein #63030509, MILAN FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. BOX 1000, MILAN, MI 48160. (LHos) |
||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/09 1:09 PM
ORDER Granting Petition to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes*
Tue 07/09 11:29 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (ABun) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 07/08 1:06 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jacob Mathias Rubinstein against Eric Rardin. (NAhm) (NAhm) |
|
Att: 1 (7/8/2024) Cover Sheet |