Taylor v. Ashley et al
Mississippi Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane M Virden |
Referred: | Jane M Virden |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00060 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Acknowledgment of Receipt
Fri 08/09 1:50 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re9 ORDER TRANSFERRING Action to Southern District Mississippi. (jla) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
utility
Case Transferred Out - District
Tue 07/23 1:24 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING Action to Southern District Mississippi. Transferred electronically via CM/ECF. Case Extracted, SDMS E-mailed. CASE CLOSED. (tab) |
|
utility
Remark
Tue 07/23 5:32 PM
Remark; transferred case opened in SDMS as 2:24-cv-110 (jla) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Amended / Supplement to Document (NOT Motion)
Tue 07/23 9:46 AM
SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT1 Complaint. (tab) |
|
Att: 1 Second Supplement, | ||
Att: 2 Third Supplement | ||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/23 9:33 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (tab) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Acknowledgment of Receipt - PSP Form
Tue 07/23 9:16 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re3 Order Setting PSP Deadline. (tab) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Acknowledgment of Receipt
Mon 07/22 4:53 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re4 Order. (tab) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/08 1:52 PM
ORDER directing plaintiff to pay the full filing fee or submit Motion to Proceed IFP within 21 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/8/2024. (jla) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order Setting PSP Deadline
Mon 07/08 12:11 PM
ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 8/8/2024.. Signed by Clerk on 7/8/2024. (jla) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment (Pro Se)
Mon 07/08 12:10 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/08 12:09 PM
PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement,, filed by Jevonnte Taylor. (jla) |