Burnell v. Cutwright
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | David A Faber |
Referred: | Joseph Keith Reeder |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00335 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal) |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response To Court Order
Wed 09/04 9:46 AM
RESPONSE by Cutwright to the Court's6 Order to Show Cause. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bailey, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Transferring MJ Referral for Pretrial and PF&R
Tue 09/03 10:08 AM
CLERK'S ORDER. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert, the above-styled civil action is referred to Honorable Joseph Keith Reeder for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. Signed by Clerk of Court Rory L. Perry II on 9/3/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (klc) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Fri 07/26 3:27 PM
LETTER to Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Prisons, from Clerk of Court dated 7/26/2024, returning check as filing fee was previously paid (cc: Renee M. Burnell w/copy of receipt). (mk) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 07/18 2:26 PM
ORDER directing Respondent to answer or otherwise respond to the1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) within 60 days of the entry of this Order showing cause, if any, why the relief sought should not be granted. Petitioner may file a reply to the answer within 60 days after service of same by the Respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 7/18/2024. (cc: Petitioner; USA w/2241 Petition) (arb) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Filing Fee Received
Thu 07/18 12:25 PM
Filing Fee: $5.00, Receipt No. 2002761. (arb) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 07/18 8:57 AM
ORDER directing Petitioner to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit a fully completed and signed Application within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 7/18/2024. (cc: Petitioner w/Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs) (mk) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Mag. Judge Eifert - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters
Tue 07/09 10:17 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (klc) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/08 4:34 PM
NOTICE to Petitioner of Failure to Remit Filing Fee. (arb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus (2241)
Mon 07/08 3:58 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Renee M. Burnell against Warden Cutwright pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2241. (arb) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Documentation, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Tue 07/09 8:31 AM
CASE assigned to Senior Judge David A. Faber. (klc) |