Garcia v. Cutwright
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | David A Faber |
Referred: | Omar J Aboulhosn |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00336 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal) |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 08/15 10:32 AM
ORDER AND NOTICE directing Petitioner to file a Reply to the7 Response to Order to Show Cause on or before 9/27/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 8/15/2024. (cc: Petitioner, pro se and counsel of record) (arb) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response To Court Order
Wed 08/14 9:34 AM
RESPONSE by Cutwright to the Court's5 Order to Show Cause. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bailey, Jason) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Return Receipt Card (Generic)
Thu 07/25 5:15 PM
RETURN RECEIPT CARD received from United States Attorney re:5 Order. Signed by M. Wallace on 7/24/2024. (arb) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 07/16 10:24 AM
ORDER directing the Respondent to file an Answer to the1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) by 8/27/2024 showing cause, if any, why the relief sought should not be granted. Petitioner may file a Reply to Respondent's Answer by 9/27/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/16/2024. (cc: Petitioner, pro se; Respondent and USA w/2241 Petition) (arb) |
|
Att: 1 Warden Cutwright Certified Mail Receipt, | ||
Att: 2 U. S. Attorney Certified Mail Receipt | ||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 07/15 4:57 PM
Filing Fee: $5.00, Receipt Number 2002750. (mk) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Mag. Judge Aboulhosn - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters
Tue 07/09 10:20 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (klc) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/08 5:05 PM
NOTICE to Petitioner of Failure to Remit Filing Fee. (arb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus (2241)
Mon 07/08 4:49 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Arlene Garcia against Warden Cutwright pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2241. (arb) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Documentation, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Tue 07/09 8:32 AM
CASE assigned to Senior Judge David A. Faber. (klc) |