Runion v. Rich et al
Tennessee Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Curtis L Collier |
Referred: | Susan K Lee |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00050 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/14 3:13 PM
ORDER re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Charles R Runion. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this Order to pay the full filing fee or to submit the necessary documents. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/14/2024. (DCB) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 08/13 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles R Runion. (SAC) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice re Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address
Tue 08/13 3:57 PM
Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (SAC) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 07/25 3:04 PM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable/ RELEASED 7/3/2024/Return To Sender/Unable To Forward. Mail sent to Charles R Runion re3 Education Order (PLU) (BJL) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Education Order (PLU)
Mon 07/08 4:32 PM
EDUCATION ORDER. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 7/8/2024. (DCB) |
|
2 | 2
motion
In Forma Pauperis (Proceed)
Mon 07/08 2:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles R Runion. (DCB) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/08 2:16 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Charles R Runion.(DCB) |