Hanna El v. United States et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Melissa Damian |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-61190 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1391 Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 22, 2024 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
Beth Bloom
|
|
Defendant
William P. Dimitrouleas
|
|
Defendant
Kevin Moore
|
|
Defendant
Angela Noble
|
|
Defendant
Rodney Smith
|
|
Defendant
United States
|
|
Defendant
Patrick A. White
|
|
Defendant
Kathleen M. Williams
|
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Anthony Hanna El
Beneficiary Title Note Holder Natural Person c/o 1119 NW 41st Terrace
Lauderhill, FL 33313 |
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 09/05 11:45 AM
Writ Amending the Record Newly Found Evidence by Raymond Anthony Hanna El (pc) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 08/16 4:21 PM
Writ Amending the Record Newly Found Evidence by Raymond Anthony Hanna El re1 Complaint, (pc) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Affidavit
Fri 08/16 4:18 PM
Affidavit of Truth signed by: Raymond Anthony Hanna EI by Raymond Anthony Hanna El (pc) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/14 10:01 AM
Notice of Acknowledgement by Raymond Anthony Hanna El (pc) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Fri 07/12 1:02 PM
Bill of Equity Complaint against Beth Bloom, William P. Dimitrouleas, Kevin Moore, Angela Noble, Rodney Smith, United States, Patrick A. White, filed by Raymond Anthony Hanna El.(pc) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/09 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Filing Amended Bill of Complaint In Equity Presentment to Void Proceedings and Jurisdiction by Raymond Anthony Hanna El. (kpe) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Clerk's Receipt (combines Filing Fee and Partial Filing Fee)
Mon 07/08 4:20 PM
Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 7/8/2024 in the amount of $ 405.00, receipt number 18680 (kpe) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 07/08 3:57 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Melissa Damian. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/08 3:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Beth Bloom, William P. Dimitrouleas, Kevin Moore, Angela Noble, Rodney Smith, United States, Patrick A. White, Kathleen M. Williams. Filing fees $ 405.00, filed by Raymond Anthony Hanna El.(ebz) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |