WRIGHT v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Leslie Abrams Gardner |
Referred: | Thomas Q Langstaff |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00102 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:402 Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Social Security Transcript
Mon 09/09 1:59 PM
ANSWER and TRANSCRIPT of Administrative Hearing re1 Complaint (IFP)(ROGERS, KRISTIN) |
|
Att: 1 Certified Transcript | ||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/23 9:19 AM
ORDER granting8 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and Directing Service. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 7/23/2024 (TQL) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Tue 07/23 8:30 AM
Notice of Deficiency ; For future reference, documents must be filed in text-searchable PDF format. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Do not refile.(bcl) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/22 12:06 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CATHY WRIGHT filed by MATTHEW D LIEBENHAUT.. Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(LIEBENHAUT, MATTHEW) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Mon 07/22 8:02 AM
Notice of Deficiency ; Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Document has incorrect case number.(bcl) |
||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/19 10:29 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CATHY WRIGHT filed by MATTHEW D LIEBENHAUT.. Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(LIEBENHAUT, MATTHEW) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Thu 07/11 3:51 PM
JUDGES CHAMBERS WILL BE NOTIFIED OF FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Notice of Deficiency ; You must submit Local Rule 9.2 Social Security Identification Form.(bcl) |
||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/09 9:40 AM
ORDER that Plaintiff submit a long form affidavit in support of the pending motion to proceed IFP. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 7/9/2024. (TQL) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Consent Form (28 USC 636) Sent
Tue 07/09 8:52 AM
Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CATHY WRIGHT (bcl) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/09 8:51 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (bcl) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Tue 07/09 8:46 AM
Notice of Deficiency ; You must submit Local Rule 9.2 Social Security Identification Form.(bcl) |
||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Tue 07/09 8:57 AM
Notice of Deficiency ; For future reference, all documents must be filed in text-searchable PDF format. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Do not refile.(bcl) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/08 3:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CATHY WRIGHT filed by MATTHEW D LIEBENHAUT.. Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(LIEBENHAUT, MATTHEW) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Complaint (IFP)
Mon 07/08 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT (IFP) against COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION filed by CATHY WRIGHT(LIEBENHAUT, MATTHEW) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |