Massey v. Coverley
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Anne R Traum |
Referred: | Carla Baldwin |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00291 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Motion Appointment of Counsel
Thu 08/08 12:46 PM
MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Jacob Angelo Massey. (DLS) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/24 12:58 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jacob Angelo Massey.(DLS) |
|
Att: 1 Financial History | ||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice Other
Wed 07/17 12:34 PM
NOTICE by Jacob Angelo Massey. (DLS) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/17 12:33 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jacob Angelo Massey. (DLS) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/12 9:07 AM
ORDER - It is therefore ordered that Plaintiff has until August 12, 2024, to either pay the full $405 filing fee or file a completed financial certificate that is signed both by the inmate and the jail official and a copy of the inmate's trust fund account statement for the previous six-month period. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff Jacob Massey the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis for an inmate and instructions for the same and retain the complaint (ECF No.1 -1) but not file it at this time. (Mailed 7/12/2024). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/12/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas
Mon 07/08 1:10 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRM) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/08 1:08 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jacob Angelo Massey.(DRM) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint |