Kazimi v. Diversified Protection Corporation
New Mexico District Court | |
Judge: | Judith C Herrera |
Referred: | Jennifer M Rozzoni |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00689 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Second Judicial District Court, Bernalillo County, D-202-CV-24-04751 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 22, 2024 2:39 AM MDT |
Defendant
Diversified Protection Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reza Kazimi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
15 | 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diversified Protection Corporation of DPC's Initial Disclosures (Valderrama, Teresa) | |
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
14 | 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Call of the Calendar set for 3/3/2026 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 340 Pecos Courtroom before District Judge Judith C. Herrera. Jury Selection/Trial set for 3/16/2026 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 340 Pecos Courtroom before District Judge Judith C. Herrera. (arp) | |
Att: 1 Pretrial Deadlines and Instructions | ||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
13 | 13 1 pgs ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni. Status Conference set for 1/22/2025 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni. (kms) | |
12 | 12 4 pgs SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni. Discovery due by 5/6/2025. Motions due by 6/5/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/5/2025. (kms) | |
11 | 11 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni: Scheduling Conference held on 8/19/2024. (kms) | |
10 | 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Grace Rhodehouse Barberena on behalf of Reza Kazimi (Rhodehouse Barberena, Grace) | |
9 | 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reza Kazimi for Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Curtice, Stephen) | |
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8 Joint Status Report & Provisional Discovery Plan by Diversified Protection Corporation (Valderrama, Teresa) | |
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE by Diversified Protection Corporation re 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, of Good Standing of Elizabeth Anne Hanson per LR 83.3 (Valderrama, Teresa) | |
ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Diversified Protection Corporation by Teresa S Valderrama on behalf of: Elizabeth Anne Hanson Fisher & Phillips LLP 300 South Fourth St., Suite 1500 Las Vegas, NV 89101 (702) 862-3803 ehanson@fisherphillips.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Valderrama, Teresa) | ||
Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9479805 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Diversified Protection Corporation (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Valderrama, Teresa) | ||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh) | ||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 ORIGINAL ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Diversified Protection Corporation. (Valderrama, Teresa) | |
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 2 pgs INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 8/12/2024. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 7/30/2024. (ccp) | |
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Diversified Protection Corporation from Second Judicial District Court, Bernalillo County NM, case number D-202-CV-2024-04751. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Diversified Protection Corporation.(Valderrama, Teresa) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A & A-1 Process Served on DEFT & Filed Return of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B Pleadings - PLTF Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C-1 State Action PLTF Jury Demand, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C-2 State Action PLTF Cert re Arbitration, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D State Action Dkt Sheet at 7-7-24, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44 DEFT Civil Cover Sheet w Attorney Information Attached | ||
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9437697 re1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Diversified Protection Corporation (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Valderrama, Teresa) | ||
United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni assigned. (jg) | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) |