Cole v. Warden Hamilton County Justice Center
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Susan J Dlott |
Referred: | Karen L Litkovitz |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00372 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Petitioner
Zakiuss Jamar Cole
|
|
Respondent
Warden Hamilton County Justice Center
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 08/27 3:41 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is therefore RECOMMENDED that this matter be DISMISSED without prejudice for want of prosecution. Objections to R&R due by 9/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 08/27/2024. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 08/06 8:02 AM
Mail sent to Zakiuss Jamar Cole as to re2 Order to Show Cause returned as undeliverable because petitioner has been released from Hamilton County Justice Center. (zmc) (zmc) |
|
Att: 1 (8/6/2024) Envelope | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
4
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 07/18 10:39 AM
ORDER - petitioner is hereby ORDERED to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Petitioner is further ORDERED to show cause, in writing within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, why the instant action should not be dismissed without prejudice on the ground that petitioner has not exhausted his available state-court remedies. Petitioner is therefore also ORDERED to update his address in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 07/17/2024. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 07/09 4:11 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Zakiuss Jamar Cole. (jlk) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Env. |