Sowell v. Doe et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael J Truncale |
Referred: | Zack Hawthorn |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00272 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Report and Recommendations
Wed 08/28 12:47 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint filed by Kenneth Sowell. It is recommended that this action should be dismissed without prejudice. Objections due within 14 days of receipt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/28/2024. (KMH) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt
Mon 08/05 1:53 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Kenneth Sowell as to2 Order on 7/30/2024. (KMH) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/19 3:49 PM
PRELIMINARY FILING FEE ORDER that Plaintiff shall, within 20 days, either pay the $405 filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to comply may result in this case being dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 7/19/2024. (KMH) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/08 2:23 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kenneth Sowell.(KMH) |
|
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/08 2:24 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (KMH) |