Lopez v. Mayborn USA, Inc.
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Michael P Shea |
Referred: | Robert A Richardson |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01164 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 22, 2024 4:24 AM EDT |
Defendant
Mayborn USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elvira Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 08/28 3:05 PM
ORDER. The21 consented-to motion for extension is GRANTED. The defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before September 30, 2024 . In addition, the parties are notified that, under Local Rule 26(f), their deadline to file a 26(f) report is 44 days after the first appearance of defense counsel, i.e., October 2, 2024 . Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 8/28/2024. (Pierson, M) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 08/29 4:25 PM
Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/2/2024; Answer deadline updated for Mayborn USA, Inc. to 9/30/2024. (Sichanh, C) |
||
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 08/26 1:10 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/30/24 to Respond to Complaint1 Complaint by Mayborn USA, Inc.. (Cole, William) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/23 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R Orr on behalf of Mayborn USA, Inc. (Orr, Matthew) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/23 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Cole on behalf of Mayborn USA, Inc. (Cole, William) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/20 10:48 AM
ORDER granting14 MOTION for Attorney Matthew R. Orr to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/19/2024. Signed by Clerk on 8/20/2024. (Peterson, M) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/20 10:47 AM
ORDER granting13 MOTION for Attorney William P. Cole to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/19/2024. Signed by Clerk on 8/20/2024. (Peterson, M) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of Good Standing
Mon 08/19 1:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew R. Orr to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7873765) by Mayborn USA, Inc.. (Welsh, Walter) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Certificate of Good Standing
Mon 08/19 1:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re13 MOTION for Attorney(s) William P. Cole to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7873752) by Mayborn USA, Inc.. (Welsh, Walter) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/19 1:02 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew R. Orr to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7873765) by Mayborn USA, Inc.. (Welsh, Walter) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/19 1:01 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) William P. Cole to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7873752) by Mayborn USA, Inc.. (Welsh, Walter) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/19 12:54 PM
Disclosure Statement by Mayborn USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mayborn Group Limited, Corporate Parent Shanghai Jahwa United Co Ltd., Corporate Parent Jake Acquisitions Limited, Corporate Parent Jake Investment Limited, Corporate Parent Jake Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Success Bidco 2 Limited, Corporate Parent Glamour Time Limited, Corporate Parent Financial Wisdom Global Limited, Corporate Parent Cayman A2, Ltd., Corporate Parent Abundant Merit Limited for Mayborn USA, Inc.. (Welsh, Walter) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/19 12:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Walter B. Welsh on behalf of Mayborn USA, Inc. (Welsh, Walter) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 07/12 9:13 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Elvira Lopez. |
|
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 07/12 9:06 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Mayborn USA, Inc. waiver sent on 7/11/2024, answer due 9/9/2024 filed by Elvira Lopez. (Laukaitis, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 07/11 10:47 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Mayborn USA, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James J. Reardon, Jr* *Reardon Scanlon LLP* *45 South Main Street, Suite 305* *West Hartford, CT 06107*. (Peterson, M) |
|
7 | 7
order
Electronic Service Documents
Thu 07/11 10:46 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of4 Electronic Filing Order,6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,5 Standing Protective Order, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,1 Complaint filed by Elvira Lopez,3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 07/11/2024. (Peterson, M) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)
Thu 07/11 10:44 AM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Peterson, M) |
|
5 | 5
order
Standing Protective Order (Intake)
Thu 07/11 10:44 AM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 07/08/2024. (Peterson, M) |
|
4 | 4
order
Electronic Filing Order
Thu 07/11 10:43 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 07/08/2024. (Peterson, M) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Pretrial Deadlines
Thu 07/11 10:43 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/6/2024. Discovery due by 1/7/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 2/11/2025. Signed by Clerk on 07/08/2024. (Peterson, M) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice re: Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/09 9:33 AM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 7/8/24.(Hushin, Z.) |
|
1 | 1
38
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/08 4:52 PM
COMPLAINT Class Action against Mayborn USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7827213.), filed by Elvira Lopez |
|
service
Request to Issue Summons
Mon 07/08 4:56 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Mayborn USA, Inc.. |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 07/09 9:40 AM
Judge Michael P Shea and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Hushin, Z.) |