Monk v. U R S Midwest Inc et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Terry A Doughty |
Referred: | Joseph H L Perez-Montes |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00898 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 9th JDC, 280066 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 22, 2024 3:27 AM CDT |
Defendant
Quincy Bridges
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Romulus Insurance Risk Retention Group Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U R S Midwest Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Monk
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order - Doughty/McClusky
Thu 09/12 8:45 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/15/2025 at 9:00 AM in Alexandria, 2nd floor before Judge Terry A Doughty. Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2025 at 1:30 PM by video conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Pretrial Order due by 8/11/2025. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 1/31/2025. Plaintiffs Witness List due by 2/28/2025. Defendants Witness List due by 3/12/2025. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 3/17/2025. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 4/1/2025. Discovery deadline 4/1/2025. Expert Depositions due by 5/1/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 5/16/2025. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 7/22/2025. Motions in Limine due by 7/18/2025. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 9/5/2025. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/12/2024. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Wed 09/04 2:45 PM
RULE 26(f) Report by Anthony Monk . (aty,Leathem, James) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent
Tue 08/20 1:15 PM
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent. If you wish to proceed before the magistrate judge, please complete and return the appropriate form located on this court's website by clicking[LINK:here] . Executed consent forms must be emailed to lawdml_consents@lawd.uscourts.gov. DO NOT return the form to the judges. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Case Management Order - Judges Drell, Doughty, James
Mon 08/12 4:15 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 9/3/2024.Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/12/2024. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/23 3:38 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Romulus Insurance Risk Retention Group Inc identifying Corporate Parents United Road Services Inc, U R S Holdco Inc, U R S Topco Corp, Charlesbank Capital Partners for Romulus Insurance Risk Retention Group Inc. (aty,Shockley, Heather) Modified docket text on 7/23/2024 (Miletello, A) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/23 3:35 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U R S Midwest Inc identifying Corporate Parents United Road Services Inc, U R S Holdco Inc, U R S Topco Corp, Charlesbank Capital Partners for U R S Midwest Inc. (aty,Shockley, Heather) Modified docket text on 7/23/2024 (Miletello, A) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/17 2:57 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Quincy Bridges, Romulus Insurance Risk Retention Group Inc, U R S Midwest Inc.(aty,Shockley, Heather) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Removal Order
Wed 07/10 2:21 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 7/10/2024. (crt,Tice, Y) |
|
5 | 5
order
Jurisdictional Review Finding
Wed 07/10 10:26 AM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 7/10/2024. (crt,Tice, Y) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Tue 07/09 2:46 PM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/9/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Tue 07/09 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal sent to Heather Marie Shockley, James L Leathem on behalf of Quincy Bridges, Anthony Monk, Romulus Insurance Risk Retention Group Inc, U R S Midwest Inc. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 7/23/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Tue 07/09 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal sent to Heather Marie Shockley on behalf of Romulus Insurance Risk Retention Group Inc, U R S Midwest Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/23/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 07/08 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 9th JDC Rapides Parish, Case Number 280066 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5991915) filed by Quincy Bridges, Romulus Insurance Risk Retention Group, Inc., URS Midwest, Inc..(Attorney Heather Marie Shockley added to party Quincy Bridges(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Marie Shockley added to party Romulus Insurance Risk Retention Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Marie Shockley added to party URS Midwest, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Shockley, Heather) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Petition, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Court Record, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - State Court Notice, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Michigan SOS filing, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - La Dept of Insurance, | ||
Att: 6 Civil cover sheet | ||
service
State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases)
Tue 07/09 2:36 PM
STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Quincy Bridges answer due 7/15/2024; Romulus Insurance Risk Retention Group Inc answer due 7/15/2024; U R S Midwest Inc answer due 7/15/2024. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at Attachment #4 to1 Notice of Removal.(crt,Crick, S) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 07/09 2:43 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Crick, S) |