Wicks v. First Property Holdings, LLC
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert J Jonker |
Referred: | Maarten Vermaat |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00112 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 22, 2024 4:28 AM EDT |
defendant
First Property Holdings, LLC
|
|
plaintiff
Cody Wicks
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 08/12 3:45 PM
SUMMONS returned executed; All Defendants (Paree, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/09 10:06 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant First Property Holdings, LLC (ems) |
|
3 | 3
service
Proposed Summons (to be issued)
Tue 07/09 9:57 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Paree, Ryan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case
Tue 07/09 9:40 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Robert J. Jonker (ems) |
|
service
Summons Not Issued
Tue 07/09 9:41 AM
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant First Property Holdings, LLC (proposed summons has not been provided by filing party) (ems) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
24
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/08 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by CODY WICKS (Paree, Ryan) |
|
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
Mon 07/08 4:49 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff CODY WICKS in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7421042 (Paree, Ryan) |