Great West Casualty Company et al v. Greyhound Lines Inc et al
New Mexico District Court | |
Judge: | Matthew L Garcia |
Referred: | Jerry H Ritter |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00690 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Twelfth Judicial District Court, D-1215-CV-24-00398 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 22, 2024 2:40 AM MDT |
Defendant
Greyhound Lines Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Great West Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Long Trucking, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 5. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg) | ||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
15 | 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greyhound Lines Inc First Supp Disclosure Statement (Schmehl, Jeramy) | |
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
14 | 14 3 pgs SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Discovery terminates 4/30/2025 . Discovery motions due by 5/7/25 . Pretrial motions due by 6/11/2025. Other deadlines contained herein. Counsel are advised that the presiding district judge, the Hon. Matthew L. Garcia, does not allow remote appearances absent extraordinary circumstances. (ama) | |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
Clerk's Minutes for telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter on 8/22/2024. Attorney Mingjie Hoemmen appeared for Plaintiffs and attorney Ryan Vetter appeared for Defendant. The parties reported no issues with initial disclosures. The Court informed the parties of its discovery dispute procedure of an informal telephonic conference with the Court prior to filing motions. No motions are pending at this time. Discovery deadlines and parameters were set as reflected in the forthcoming Scheduling Order filed separately. The parties intend to proceed with private mediation at this juncture. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ama) | ||
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter DIRECTING PARTIES to amended telephonic conference call-in instructions for Rule 16 Conference set for Thursday, August 22, 2024, at 10:00 AM per6 . Parties shall call my toll-free AT&T conference line at (888) 278-0296, enter access code 9998216, and press #, then when prompted enter the security code 3334 and press # to be joined to the conference. Conference shall otherwise proceed as scheduled. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ama) | ||
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
11 | 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mingjie L Hoemmen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hoemmen, Mingjie) | |
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
10 | 10 Joint Status Report by Greyhound Lines Inc (Schmehl, Jeramy) | |
9 | 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Great West Casualty Company, Long Trucking, LLC of Initial Disclosures (Quintero, Penelope) | |
8 | 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greyhound Lines Inc Initial Disclosures (Schmehl, Jeramy) | |
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Matthew L. Garcia as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc) | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 2 pgs INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter SETTING a telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for Thursday, August 22, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. Mountain Time. Counsel shall call 888-278-0296 (access code: 9998216#) to connect to the proceeding. Joint Status Report and Initial Disclosures are due by August 15, 2024 . Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than August 8, 2024 . Consent is strictly voluntary. (ama) | |
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Great West Casualty Company, Long Trucking, LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Padilla, Richard) | ||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Subrogation, Negligence, Negligence per se, Damages and Costs by Greyhound Lines Inc. (Schmehl, Jeramy) | |
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Greyhound Lines Inc from Twelfth Judicial District Court, case number D-1215-CV-2024-00398. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Greyhound Lines Inc.(Schmehl, Jeramy) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr) | ||
United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (dr) | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) | ||
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number ANMDC-9438047 re1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Greyhound Lines Inc from Twelfth Judicial District Court, case number D-1215-CV-2024-00398. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Greyhound Lines Inc.(Schmehl, Jeramy) filed by Greyhound Lines Inc (arp) |