JB v. Horizon Air Industries, Inc.
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Karin J Immergut |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01111 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 4:03 AM PDT |
Defendant
Horizon Air Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JB
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
order
1 - Scheduling
Tue 09/03 12:11 PM
Scheduling Order. Telephonic Rule 16 Conference is set for 9/9/2024 at 01:00PM in Portland by telephone before Judge Karin J. Immergut. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy) |
||
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/29 11:03 AM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Tiffany T. Tran. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9554769. Filed by Horizon Air Industries, Inc.. (Tran, Tiffany) Modified docket text on 8/29/2024 to correct attorney requesting Pro Hac Vice admission. (dino) |
|
attyadm
Clerk's Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion
Thu 08/29 11:46 AM
Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Tiffany T. Tran. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-95547699 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino) |
||
order
Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/29 11:52 AM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 9 by attorney Tiffany T. Tran. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy) |
||
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/30 2:50 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Horizon Air Industries, Inc.. (Goldberg, Josh) |
|
7 | 7
oth_doc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/30 2:48 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement for Defendant horizon Air Industries, Inc. . Filed by Horizon Air Industries, Inc.. (Goldberg, Josh) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
order
Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/22 10:09 AM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 4 by attorney Jacob James Roes. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy) |
||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 07/19 9:53 AM
Affidavit of Service upon Horizon Air Industries, Inc. served on 7/9/2024, answer due on 7/30/2024 Filed by JB. (Templeton, Emily) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/19 9:02 AM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jacob James Roes. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9498777. Filed by Horizon Air Industries, Inc.. (Roes, Jacob) |
|
attyadm
Clerk's Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion
Fri 07/19 10:29 AM
Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jacob James Roes. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-94987774 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/08 2:45 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Horizon Air Industries, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp) |
|
2 | 2
order
3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT
Mon 07/08 2:43 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 11/5/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/5/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 12/5/2024. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (ecp) |
|
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/08 1:46 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9483242 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by JB against Horizon Air Industries, Inc.. (Fuller, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 |