Howard v. Smith, Rouchon & Associates, Inc.
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kristi H Johnson |
Referred: | Michael T Parker |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00394 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court of Hinds County, 25CI1:24-cv-00388-AH |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 22, 2024 3:31 AM CDT |
Defendant
Smith, Rouchon & Associates, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amber Howard
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
discov
Notice of Service of Disclosure
Fri 08/30 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Smith, Rouchon & Associates, Inc. (McMullan, Johanna) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Rule 16(a) Initial Order
Thu 08/08 3:09 PM
Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2024 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 9/3/24. (KPM) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/15 3:56 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Smith, Rouchon & Associates, Inc..(Westbrook, William) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/12 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Johanna M. McMullan on behalf of Smith, Rouchon & Associates, Inc. (McMullan, Johanna) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 07/08 4:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Smith, Rouchon & Associates, Inc. from Circuit Court of Hinds County, case number 25CI1:24-cv-00388-AHW. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMSSDC-5445146) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (KNS) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court documents served on Defendant, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |