Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. Patel et al
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Henry T Wingate |
Referred: | Lakeysha Greer Isaac |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00393 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance) |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit - Hinds, 19-00046 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 22, 2024 3:31 AM CDT |
Defendant
J & R International IV LLC
|
|
Defendant
J & R International XIII LLC
|
|
Defendant
Jayesh Patel
|
|
Defendant
Clifton Smith
|
|
Defendant
Donashae Griffin Smith
|
|
Plaintiff
Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 09/09 5:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Stamps on behalf of Clifton Smith, Donashae Griffin Smith (Stamps, Larry) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 08/27 4:25 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by J & R International IV LLC, J & R International XIII LLC, Jayesh Patel.(Tullos, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/01 11:26 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. J & R International XIII LLC served on 7/15/2024, answer due 8/5/2024. (Tatum, Patrick) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/01 11:25 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. J & R International IV LLC served on 7/17/2024, answer due 8/7/2024. (Tatum, Patrick) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/01 11:23 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Jayesh Patel served on 7/17/2024, answer due 8/7/2024. (Tatum, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/10 2:02 PM
Summons Issued as to J & R International IV LLC, J & R International XIII LLC, Jayesh Patel, Clifton Smith, Donashae Griffin Smith. (cwl) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
7
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/08 4:31 PM
COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against J & R International IV LLC, J & R International XIII LLC, Jayesh Patel, Clifton Smith, Donashae Griffin Smith ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 8975), filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(cwl) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Policy, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Summons as to Jayesh Patel, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |