TAYLOR v. KEMP et al
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Leslie Abrams Gardner |
Referred: | Thomas Q Langstaff |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00101 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Acknowledgment of Electronic Case Transfer
Tue 07/30 2:01 PM
Acknowledgment of Electronic Case Transfer Out by District of Northern District of Georgia Atlanta Division; Case Number 1:24-CV-3385. (mdm) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order of Transfer/Local Rule 3.4 Statement
Mon 07/15 3:55 PM
ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia Atlanta Division. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 07/15/2024. (mdm) |
|
transfer
Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer
Mon 07/15 3:57 PM
Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Northern District of Georgia Atlanta Division. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 7/29/2024. (mdm) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/09 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Filing by CHARLES MYRON TAYLOR, II (mdm) |
|
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/08 3:38 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (mdm) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/08 3:37 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by CHARLES MYRON TAYLOR, II.(mdm) |
|
Att: 1 UCC Forms, Indemity Agreements, Common Law Copyright Notice, Form 56 & W-8BEN, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |